EP0563547 - Cabriolet-top with a flexible window pane [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.04.1998 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 08.09.2004 [2004/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr.Ing.h.c. F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Porschestrasse 42 70435 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/40] | For all designated states Dr.Ing.h.c. F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Porschestrasse 42 D-70435 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schnepf, Wolfgang Kernerstrasse 1 W-7135 Wiernsheim-Serres / DE | [1993/40] | Application number, filing date | 93102100.0 | 11.02.1993 | [1993/40] | Priority number, date | DE19924210475 | 31.03.1992 Original published format: DE 4210475 | [1993/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0563547 | Date: | 06.10.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0563547 | Date: | 28.05.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B60J1/20 | [1993/40] | CPC: |
B60J11/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1993/40] | Title | German: | Cabrio-Verdeck mit einer flexiblen Sichtscheibe | [1993/40] | English: | Cabriolet-top with a flexible window pane | [1993/40] | French: | Capote pour cabriolet avec une vitre flexible | [1993/40] | Examination procedure | 02.03.1994 | Examination requested [1994/17] | 31.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.12.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 12.02.1998 | [2004/37] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0261323 (SCHARWAECHTER GMBH CO KG [DE]); | [Y]DE2615567 (EICHSTAEDT WOLFGANG DIPL ING) |