EP0556760 - Clamping device for a flat workpiece [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROTOX GmbH B. EISENBACH Am Sportplatz D-56858 Grenderich / DE | [1993/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eisenbach, Bernhard Taunusstr. 24 W-6259 Brechen / DE | [1993/34] | Representative(s) | Katscher, Helmut Katscher Habermann Patentanwälte Dolivostrasse 15A 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/34] | Katscher, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing. Fröbelweg 1 D-64291 Darmstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 93102330.3 | 15.02.1993 | [1993/34] | Priority number, date | DE19924204520 | 15.02.1992 Original published format: DE 4204520 | [1993/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0556760 | Date: | 25.08.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0556760 | Date: | 03.05.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q1/01, B23Q3/06 | [1995/18] | CPC: |
B23Q3/06 (EP);
B23Q1/03 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1993/34] | B23Q1/02, B23Q3/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1993/34] | Title | German: | Spannvorrichtung für Flachmaterial | [1993/34] | English: | Clamping device for a flat workpiece | [1993/34] | French: | Dispositif de serrage pour des pièces de forme plane | [1993/34] | Examination procedure | 18.10.1993 | Examination requested [1993/50] | 05.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.11.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 03.12.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 03.05.1995 | FR | 03.05.1995 | IT | 03.05.1995 | [2006/14] |
Former [2002/25] | ES | 03.05.1995 | |
IT | 03.05.1995 | ||
FR | 29.09.1995 | ||
Former [1999/42] | IT | 03.05.1995 | |
FR | 29.09.1995 | ||
Former [1996/01] | FR | 29.09.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2045244 (EISENBACH B); | [A]US3902706 (PINCHA PHILIP J); | [A]DE8704208U ; | [A]US3412644 (POORMAN ROYAL H); | [A]SU1585120 (UK NII STANKOV INSTR [SU]) |