EP0558995 - Locking mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.08.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.10.1996 [1996/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Adam Opel Aktiengesellschaft Bahnhofsplatz 1 65428 Rüsselsheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/36] | For all designated states Adam Opel Aktiengesellschaft Bahnhofsplatz 1 D-65428 Rüsselsheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heck, Thomas Am Königsborn 17 W-6500 Mainz 21 / DE | [1993/36] | Representative(s) | Bergerin, Ralf, et al Adam Opel AG Patentwesen/80-34 65423 Rüsselsheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/11] | Bergerin, Ralf, Dipl.-Ing., et al Adam Opel AG Patentwesen D-65423 Rüsselsheim / DE | ||
Former [1993/36] | Bergerin, Ralf, Dipl.-Ing. ADAM OPEL AG Patentwesen D-65423 Rüsselsheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 93102430.1 | 17.02.1993 | [1993/36] | Priority number, date | DE19924206629 | 03.03.1992 Original published format: DE 4206629 | [1993/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0558995 | Date: | 08.09.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0558995 | Date: | 11.10.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F16H35/14, B60H1/00, B62D25/12, G05G5/06 | [1993/36] | CPC: |
B62D25/12 (EP,US);
B60H1/00857 (EP,US);
F16H35/14 (EP,US);
G05G5/06 (EP,US);
Y10T292/289 (EP,US);
Y10T74/18856 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1993/36] | Title | German: | Arretierungsmechanismus | [1993/36] | English: | Locking mechanism | [1993/36] | French: | Mécanisme d'arrêt | [1993/36] | Examination procedure | 02.11.1993 | Examination requested [1993/52] | 16.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.04.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP61181717 ; | [A]FR2407114 (ALFA ROMEO SPA [IT]); | [AD]US4651583 (SUZUKI KAZUHIRO [JP]); | [A]US4653689 (SAKURAI YUKIO [JP], et al); | [A]DE3904570 (BRITAX LTD [GB]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 1 (M-550)(2448) 6. Januar 1987 & JP-A-61 181 717 ( NIPPON DENSO ) 14. August 1986, & JP61181717 A 00000000 |