EP0556837 - Method of joining superconducting wire using oxide high-temperature superconductor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 15.04.2003 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, LIMITED 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/34] | For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, LIMITED 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fujikami, Jun, c/o Osaka Works Sumitomo Elec. Ind., Ltd., 1-3, Shimaya 1-chome Konohana-ku, Osaka / JP | 02 /
Sato, Kenichi, c/o Osaka Works Sumitomo Elec. Ind., Ltd., 1-3, Shimaya 1-chome Konohana-ku, Osaka / JP | 03 /
Shibuta, Nobuhiro, c/o Osaka Works Sumitomo Elec. Ind., Ltd., 1-3, Shimaya 1-chome Konohana-ku, Osaka / JP | 04 /
Mukai, Hidehito, c/o Osaka Works Sumitomo Elec. Ind., Ltd., 1-3, Shimaya 1-chome Konohana-ku, Osaka / JP | 05 /
Kato, Takeshi, c/o Osaka Works Sumitomo Elec. Ind., Ltd., 1-3, Shimaya 1-chome Konohana-ku, Osaka / JP | [1993/34] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [1993/34] | KUHNEN, WACKER & PARTNER Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 D-85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 93102579.5 | 18.02.1993 | [1993/34] | Priority number, date | JP19920033421 | 20.02.1992 Original published format: JP 3342192 | JP19920156781 | 16.06.1992 Original published format: JP 15678192 | [1993/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0556837 | Date: | 25.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0556837 | Date: | 17.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H01R4/68, H01L39/02 | [1993/34] | CPC: |
H01F6/065 (EP,US);
H01R4/68 (EP,US);
H10N60/80 (EP,US);
Y10S505/925 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1993/34] | Title | German: | Verfahren für die Verbindung von supraleitenden Drähte aus Oxyd-Hochtemperatur-Supraleiter | [1993/34] | English: | Method of joining superconducting wire using oxide high-temperature superconductor | [1993/34] | French: | Méthode pour connecter des fils supraconducteurs à base d'oxyde supraconducteur haute-température | [1993/34] | Examination procedure | 12.01.1994 | Examination requested [1994/11] | 25.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.03.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
26.05.1998
ADMISSIBLE Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 D-80506 München / DE | [1998/30] | 17.07.1998 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 11.12.1998 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 27.03.2000 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.04.2000 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 17.04.2000 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 19.02.2003 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2003/22] | 02.04.2003 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 31.05.2000 | Appeal received No. T0571/00 | 08.08.2000 | Statement of grounds filed | 19.02.2003 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 19.02.2003 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.02.2003 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 01.09.2001 | [2002/14] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CH482317 (OERLIKON MASCHF [CH]); | [A]DE1930034 (SIEMENS AG); | [A]DE2033615 ; | [Y]EP0371410 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | [A]US5051399 (YOSHIZUMI MOTOHIKO [JP], et al) |