EP0611623 - Fixing attachment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.1997 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.04.1997 [1997/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alfred H. Schütte GmbH & Co. KG. Alfred-Schütte-Allee 76 51105 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/03] | For all designated states Alfred H. Schütte GmbH & Co. KG. Alfred-Schütte-Allee 76 D-51105 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1994/34] | For all designated states ALFRED H. SCHÜTTE WERKZEUGMASCHINENFABRIK Alfred-Schütte-Allee 76 D-51105 Köln / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Werner, Heinz A., Dipl.-Ing. Edmund-Richen-Strasse 30 W-5000 Köln 71 / DE | [1994/34] | Representative(s) | Hennicke, Albrecht, et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Buschhoff Dipl.-Ing. Hennicke Dipl.-Ing. Vollbach Postfach 19 04 08 50501 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/34] | Hennicke, Albrecht, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Buschhoff Dipl.-Ing. Hennicke Dipl.-Ing. Vollbach Postfach 19 04 08 D-50501 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 93102592.8 | 19.02.1993 | [1994/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0611623 | Date: | 24.08.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0611623 | Date: | 17.04.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B23B29/24 | [1994/34] | CPC: |
B25B5/006 (EP,US);
B23Q1/28 (EP,US);
Y10T82/2585 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1994/34] | Title | German: | Aufspannvorrichtung | [1994/34] | English: | Fixing attachment | [1994/34] | French: | Dispositif de fixation | [1994/34] | Examination procedure | 19.02.1993 | Examination requested [1994/34] | 19.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.10.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0423426 (GILDEMEISTER SPA [IT]) |