EP0553887 - Catalysts and epoxy resin composition containing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.10.2000 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.12.2000 [2000/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Dow Center Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | [1998/02] |
Former [1997/48] | For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Dow Center Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | ||
Former [1993/31] | For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Dow Center Abbott Road P.O. Box 1967 Midland Michigan 48640-1967 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bertram, James L. 115 Southern Oaks Drive Lake Jackson, Texas 77566 / US | 02 /
Walker, Louis L. 246 Barbara Drive Clute, Texas 77531 / US | 03 /
Muskopf, John W. 119 Mistletoe Lake Jackson, Texas 77566 / US | [1993/31] | Representative(s) | Sternagel, Hans-Günther, et al Sternagel, Fleischer, Godemeyer & Partner Patentanwälte Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/03] | Sternagel, Hans-Günther, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Sternagel & Fleischer Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | ||
Former [1993/31] | Sternagel, Hans-Günther, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dr. Michael Hann Dr. H.-G. Sternagel Sander Aue 30 D-51465 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 93102597.7 | 06.02.1989 | [1993/31] | Priority number, date | US19880155381 | 12.02.1988 Original published format: US 155381 | US19880274250 | 18.11.1988 Original published format: US 274250 | US19880274227 | 18.11.1988 Original published format: US 274227 | [1993/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0553887 | Date: | 04.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0553887 | Date: | 13.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C08G59/72, C08G59/62, C08G59/68, C08G59/06, C07F5/02, B01J27/24, B01J21/02 | [1993/43] | CPC: |
C08G59/72 (EP);
C08G59/18 (KR);
B29C67/246 (EP);
C08G59/066 (EP);
C08G59/62 (EP);
C08G59/621 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C08L63/00, C08L61/04 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1993/31] | C08G59/72, C08G59/62, C08G59/68 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1993/31] | Title | German: | Katalysatoren und diese enthaltende Epoxyharz-Zusammensetzungen | [1993/31] | English: | Catalysts and epoxy resin composition containing the same | [1993/31] | French: | Catalyseurs et compositions de résine époxy les contenant | [1993/31] | Examination procedure | 22.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/31] | 18.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.02.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/49] | 20.05.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2000/49] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP89102012.5 / EP0328020 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1994 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   29.04.1994 | 28.02.1999 | 11   M06   Not yet paid | 29.02.2000 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP56059841 ; | DE2412882 [ ]; | EP0066543 [ ] (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | GB2099825 [ ] (CIBA GEIGY AG); | US4366295 [ ] (TYLER JR MANUEL C, et al); | WO8600627 [ ] (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]); | EP0239784 [ ] (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]); | US4775734 [ ] (GOEL ANIL B [US]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 5, no. 124 (C-066)11 August 1981 & JP-A-56 059 841 ( HITACHI ) 23 May 1981, & JP56059841 A 19810523 |