EP0557921 - Check-out device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.03.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha TEC 570 Ohito, Ohito-cho, Tagata-gun Shizuoka 410-2392 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/01] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha TEC 570 Ohito, Ohito-cho, Tagata-gun Shizuoka / JP | ||
Former [1993/35] | For all designated states TOKYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 6-13, 2-chome, Nakameguro Meguro-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ikeda, Tsutomu 2-6-21, Numakita-cho Numazu-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | 02 /
Akita, Hiromasa c/o K.K. TEC, Int. Prop. Div., 1-1, Kanda Nishiki- cho, Chiyoda-Ku, Tokyo 101 / JP | [1996/43] |
Former [1993/35] | 01 /
Ikeda, Tsutomu 2-6-21, Numakita-cho Numazu-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Akita, Hiromasa 183-55, Makinogou, Shuzenji-cho Tagata-gun, Shizuoka-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Weber, Joachim, et al Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/35] | Weber, Joachim, Dr., et al Hoefer, Schmitz, Weber Patentanwälte Ludwig-Ganghofer-Strasse 20 D-82031 Grünwald / DE | Application number, filing date | 93102738.7 | 22.02.1993 | [1993/35] | Priority number, date | JP19920036064 | 24.02.1992 Original published format: JP 3606492 | JP19920061987 | 18.03.1992 Original published format: JP 6198792 | [1993/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0557921 | Date: | 01.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0557921 | Date: | 26.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0557921 | Date: | 02.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G07G1/00, A47F9/04 | [1994/43] | CPC: |
G01G19/4144 (EP,US);
G06F17/00 (KR);
G07G1/0036 (EP,US);
G07G1/0054 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1993/35] | G07G1/00 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1993/35] | Title | German: | Warenabrechnungsanlage | [1993/35] | English: | Check-out device | [1993/35] | French: | Dispositif de caisse de sortie | [1993/35] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1996/29: Teilanmeldung 96105966.4 eingereicht am 16/04/96 | EPB 1996/29: Divisional application 96105966.4 filed on 16/04/96 | EPB 1996/29: Demande divisionnaire 96105966.4 déposée le 16/04/96 | Examination procedure | 22.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/35] | 06.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP96105966.4 / EP0729121 | Opposition(s) | 03.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 02.05.1997 | NL | 02.05.1997 | [2003/07] |
Former [1998/10] | BE | 02.05.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]GB2161631 (CHECKROBOT INC) [DA] 1-6 * page 6 - page 11; tables STATUS-TABLE * * page 12, line 1 - page 13, line 51; figure 4 *; | [A]US3681571 (STROHSCHNEIDER WALTER) [A] 6-9 * column 1, line 45 - column 2, line 54; figure 1 *; | [AP]EP0484300 (AWAX PROGETTAZIONE [IT]) [AP] 1-9 * column 2, line 21 - line 53; figure 4; claims 2,3 *; | [AP]EP0491348 (MANNERJOKI MIKA [FI], et al) [AP] 1-9 * column 6, line 1 - column 8, line 22 *; | [A]US5046570 (EMME NILS-ERIK [SE], et al) [A] 1,2 * column W *; | [A]BE899018 (AGEMETAL S A); | [A]US3681570 (ABT JURG) |