Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5405360 | 11.04.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | US9605993 | 22.07.1993 | US84038692 | 24.02.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0557963 | Global Dossier | 01.09.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US84038692 | 24.02.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2089999 | 25.08.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US84038692 | 24.02.1992 |