EP0557963 - Resilient arm mesh deployer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.12.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.1994 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.02.1995 [1995/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United States Surgical Corporation 150 Glover Avenue Norwalk Connecticut 06856 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/35] | For all designated states United States Surgical Corporation 150 Glover Avenue Norwalk, Connecticut 06856 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tovey, H. Jonathan 58B Rogers Avenue Milford, CT 06460 / US | [1993/35] | Representative(s) | Marsh, Roy David, et al Hoffmann Eitle ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/35] | Marsh, Roy David, et al Hoffmann Eitle & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93102870.8 | 24.02.1993 | [1993/35] | Priority number, date | US19920840386 | 24.02.1992 Original published format: US 840386 | [1993/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0557963 | Date: | 01.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/00, A61F2/00 | [1993/35] | CPC: |
A61B17/00234 (EP,US);
A61F2/0063 (EP,US);
A61B17/0469 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2927 (EP,US);
A61F2002/0072 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30092 (EP,US);
A61F2210/0019 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1993/35] | Title | German: | Federnder Arm zur Entfaltung eines Netzwerks | [1993/35] | English: | Resilient arm mesh deployer | [1993/35] | French: | Bras élastique pour déployer une maille | [1993/35] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 02.02.1994 | Examination requested [1994/14] | 22.12.1994 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1995/07] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]EP0525791 (DEMATTEIS RALPH A [US]); | [A]DE2822603 (THIERFELDER KAY DR); | [A]WO9102493 (RAYCHEM CORP [US]); | [A]EP0364420 |