EP0544648 - Method for forming a planarized Al thin film [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1993/22] | Method for forming a planarized D1 thin film | ||
[1993/46] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.1998 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.04.1998 [1998/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON TELEGRAPH AND TELEPHONE CORPORATION 19-2 Nishi-Shinjuku 3-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-19 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/20] | For all designated states NIPPON TELEGRAPH AND TELEPHONE CORPORATION 19-2 Nishi-Shinjuku 3-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo 163-19 / JP | ||
Former [1993/22] | For all designated states Nippon Telegraph and Telephone Corporation 1-6 Uchisaiwai-cho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kamoshida, Kazuyoshi 1182-1, Hase, Atsugi-shi Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Nakamura, Hiroaki 4-16-5 Matsugaoka, Kugenuma Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 03 /
Amazawa, Takao 3004-1, Ochiai, Tama-shi Tokyo / JP | [1993/32] |
Former [1993/22] | 01 /
Kamoshida, Kazuyoshi 3-402-861-1 Ishida Isehara-shi, Kanagawa / JP | ||
02 /
Nakamura, Hiroaki 4-16-5 Matsugaoka, Kugenuma Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa / JP | |||
03 /
Amazawa, Takao 1-28-1-201 Morinosato Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa / JP | Representative(s) | Tiedtke, Harro Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/22] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93102886.4 | 12.05.1986 | [1993/22] | Priority number, date | JP19850099505 | 13.05.1985 Original published format: JP 9950585 | JP19850209741 | 20.09.1985 Original published format: JP 20974185 | [1993/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0544648 | Date: | 02.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0544648 | Date: | 16.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0544648 | Date: | 09.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/768 | [1997/15] | CPC: |
H01L21/2636 (EP,US);
H01L21/32115 (EP,US);
H01L21/34 (KR);
H01L21/7684 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1994/07] | H01L21/31, H01L21/90 | ||
Former IPC [1993/22] | H01L21/321, H01L21/90 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1993/22] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Planarisierung einer dünnen Al-Schicht | [1993/46] | English: | Method for forming a planarized Al thin film | [1993/46] | French: | Méthode pour planariser une couche mince en Al | [1993/46] |
Former [1993/22] | Verfahren zur Planarisierung einer dünnen Dl-Schicht | ||
Former [1993/22] | Method for forming a planarized D1 thin film | ||
Former [1993/22] | Méthode pour planariser une couche mince en Dl | Examination procedure | 13.05.1994 | Examination requested [1994/28] | 31.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP86106432.7 / EP0202572 | Opposition(s) | 10.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2080620 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO) [A] 1 * page 1, line 51 - line 69; figure 1; claims 3,6,7 *; | [A] - G HUGHES ET AL., "NEW SPUTTERING TECHNIQUES FOR SEMICONDUCTOR METALLIZATION", VACUUM, NEW YORK, (1984), vol. 34, no. 3 4, doi:doi:10.1016/0042-207X(84)90068-X, pages 365 - 369, XP025722175 [A] 1,2 * page 365, column L, paragraph 5 - page 367, column R, paragraph 3; figures 1-6,9,10 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0042-207X(84)90068-X | Examination | - VSLI Electronics Microstructure Science, vol. 21, "beam processing technologies", ed. N.G. Einspruch, academic Press, 1989, pages 159 & 203 |