EP0565832 - Hydraulic vehicle vibration damper [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.1996 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.04.1996 [1996/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states August Bilstein GmbH & Co. KG Postfach 11 51 58240 Ennepetal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/42] | For all designated states AUGUST BILSTEIN GMBH & CO. KG Postfach 11 51 D-58240 Ennepetal / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Angermann, Rolf, Dr. Westender Weg W-5804 Herdecke / DE | 02 /
Hölscher, Reinhard, Dr. Kottenstrasse 25 W-4796 Salzkotten / DE | 03 /
Hansemann, Volker, Dipl.-Ing. Bahnhofstrasse 2 W-5960 Olpe / DE | 04 /
Kolz, Berthold Grendericher Strasse 1 W-5509 Gusenburg / DE | 05 /
Theobald, Walter, Dipl.-Ing. Burgstrasse 13 W-6649 Weiskirchen / DE | 06 /
Wiegand, Friedrich, Dipl.-Ing. Schulstrasse 5 W-5501 Waldrach / DE | [1993/42] | Application number, filing date | 93102907.8 | 25.02.1993 | [1993/42] | Priority number, date | DE19924212228 | 11.04.1992 Original published format: DE 4212228 | [1993/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0565832 | Date: | 20.10.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0565832 | Date: | 12.04.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F16F9/49 | [1993/42] | CPC: |
F16F9/49 (EP);
F16F9/516 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1993/42] | Title | German: | Hydraulischer Schwingungsdämpfer für Kraftfahrzeuge | [1993/42] | English: | Hydraulic vehicle vibration damper | [1993/42] | French: | Amortisseur de vibrations hydraulique pour véhicule | [1993/42] | Examination procedure | 25.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/42] | 29.08.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1305311 ; | [A]US3175645 (WILLI SCHAFER, et al) |