Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0560131
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
12.09.1997 |
Correction of patent specification |
published on 29.10.1997 [1997/44] |
25.07.1997 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 10.09.1997 [1997/37] |
02.08.1996 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 18.09.1996 [1996/38] |
10.05.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
09.03.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
06.03.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
20.02.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
29.01.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
22.09.1995 |
First examination report |
|
29.07.1993 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 15.09.1993 [1993/37] |
29.07.1993 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 15.09.1993 [1993/37] |