EP0557993 - Process for production of N-substituted carbazoles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.1996 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.07.1996 [1996/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY, LIMITED 5-33 Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/35] | For all designated states SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY, LIMITED 5-33 Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kamitamari, Masashi 1-2-40, Hirata Ibaraki-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | 02 /
Kamikawa, Takashi 2-10-3-317, Sonehigashinocho Toyonaka-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | 03 /
Maruyama, Osamu 1-9-1-211, Tamagawa Takatsuki-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | 04 /
Masaki, Shinzaburo 9-6-4-202, Honmachi Toyonaka-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | 05 /
Shiraiwa, Junji 9-17, Chiyodaminamimachi Kawachinagano-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | [1993/35] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/35] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93102962.3 | 25.02.1993 | [1993/35] | Priority number, date | JP19920041155 | 27.02.1992 Original published format: JP 4115592 | [1993/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0557993 | Date: | 01.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0557993 | Date: | 05.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C07D209/86, C07D209/88 | [1993/35] | CPC: |
C07D209/86 (EP,US);
C07D209/88 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1993/35] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von N-substituiertem Carbazol | [1993/35] | English: | Process for production of N-substituted carbazoles | [1993/35] | French: | Procédé de préparation de N-substitués carbazoles | [1993/35] | Examination procedure | 09.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/05] | 09.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.01.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.04.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 95, no. 13, 1981, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 115228j, 'A convenient preparation of some N-alkylcarbazoles and N-alkylacridones' page 674 ; | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 87, no. 17, 1977, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 135056q, 'pressuerless preparation of N-alkyl derivatives of carbazole' page 704 ; | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 97, no. 15, 1982, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 127498b, 'N-substituted carbazoles' page 713 ; | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 111, no. 9, 1989, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 78015p, 'preparation of carbazole, phenoxazine or phenothiazine derivatives' page 756 ; | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 78, no. 15, 1973, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 97478h, 'N-ethylcarbazole' page 464 ; | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 82, no. 8, 1975, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 45003, 'preparation of N-alkylcarbazole by alkylation of carbazole with benzenesulfonic acid esters' page 100 ; |