EP0558005 - Engine controller [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.03.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.05.1997 [1997/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/35] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Endou, Kouji 4-48, Heiwa-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471 / JP | [1993/35] | Representative(s) | Tiedtke, Harro Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/35] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93102980.5 | 25.02.1993 | [1993/35] | Priority number, date | JP19920039708 | 26.02.1992 Original published format: JP 3970892 | [1993/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0558005 | Date: | 01.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0558005 | Date: | 13.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0558005 | Date: | 08.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.1994 | Classification | IPC: | F02P5/15, F02D41/08 | [1994/27] | CPC: |
F02P5/1506 (EP,US);
F02D41/08 (EP,US);
F02P5/1508 (EP,US);
Y02T10/40 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1993/35] | F02P5/15 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/35] | Title | German: | Motorsteuergerät | [1993/35] | English: | Engine controller | [1993/35] | French: | Dispositif de commande de moteur | [1993/35] | Examination procedure | 25.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/35] | 07.09.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.11.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS61277839 ; | [A]JPH03172556 ; | [A]US4554900 (KOMODA TAKAO [JP]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]JPH0295775 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870508), vol. 11, no. 140, Database accession no. (M - 586), & JP61277839 A 19861208 (MITSUBISHI MOTOR CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911022), vol. 15, no. 414, Database accession no. (M - 1171), & JP03172556 A 19910725 (MAZDA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900628), vol. 14, no. 300, Database accession no. (M - 991), & JP02095775 A 19900406 (SUZUKI MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |