EP0563575 - Method and apparatus for continuous production of a composite pipe with sleeve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 12.11.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hegler, Ralph-Peter, Dr.-Ing. Schillerstrasse 7 97688 Bad Kissingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/38] | For all designated states Hegler, Ralph Peter, Dr.-Ing. Schillerstrasse 7 97688 Bad Kissingen / DE | ||
Former [1993/40] | For all designated states Hegler, Wilhelm Goethestrasse 2 D-97688 Bad Kissingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hegler, Ralph-Peter, Dr. Schillerstrasse 7 W-8730 Bad Kissingen / DE | 02 /
Hegler, Wilhelm Goethestrasse 2 W-8730 Bad Kissingen / DE | [1993/40] | Representative(s) | Rau, Manfred, et al Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Königstraße 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/40] | Rau, Manfred, Dr. Dipl.-Ing., et al Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Königstrasse 2 D-90402 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 93103013.4 | 26.02.1993 | [1993/40] | Priority number, date | DE19924210482 | 31.03.1992 Original published format: DE 4210482 | [1993/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0563575 | Date: | 06.10.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0563575 | Date: | 29.12.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0563575 | Date: | 27.09.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B29C49/00, B29C47/12, B29C47/06 | [1993/40] | CPC: |
B29C49/0031 (EP,US);
B29C48/09 (EP,US);
B29C48/11 (EP,US);
B29C48/13 (EP,US);
B29C48/21 (EP,US);
B29C48/303 (EP,US);
B29C48/335 (EP,US);
B29C49/0021 (EP,US);
B29C2791/006 (EP,US);
B29C48/10 (EP,US);
B29C49/0025 (EP);
B29L2016/00 (EP,US);
B29L2023/18 (EP,US);
B29L2023/183 (EP,US);
B29L2023/186 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1993/40] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur fortlaufenden Herstellung eines Verbundrohres mit Rohr-Muffe | [1993/40] | English: | Method and apparatus for continuous production of a composite pipe with sleeve | [1993/40] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de production en continu d'un tube composite avec manchon | [1993/40] | Examination procedure | 30.09.1993 | Examination requested [1993/47] | 29.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.03.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
21.06.1996
10.07.1996
ADMISSIBLE Corma Inc. 10 McLeary Court Concord (Toronto), Ontario, L4k 2Z3 / CA Opponent's representative Witte, Alexander Witte, Weller, Gahlert, Otten & Steil, Patentanwälte, Postfach 105 462 70047 Stuttgart / DE | 02
27.06.1996
09.07.1996
ADMISSIBLE Fränkische Rohrwerke Gebr. Kirchner Gmbh & Co. KG Hellinger Str. 1 97486 Königsberg/Bayern / DE Opponent's representative Schwabe, Hans-Georg Schwabe, Sandmair, Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/10] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.06.1996
10.07.1996
ADMISSIBLE Corma Inc. 10 McLeary Court Concord (Toronto), Ontario, L4k 2Z3 / CA Opponent's representative Witte, Alexander, Dr.-Ing. Witte, Weller, Gahlert, Otten & Steil, Patentanwälte, Postfach 105 462 70047 Stuttgart / DE | ||
02
27.06.1996
09.07.1996
ADMISSIBLE Fränkische Rohrwerke Gebr. Kirchner Gmbh & Co. KG Hellinger Str. 1 97486 Königsberg/Bayern / DE Opponent's representative Schwabe, Hans-Georg Schwabe, Sandmair, Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | |||
Former [1996/34] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.06.1996
10.07.1996
ADMISSIBLE Corma Inc. 10 McLeary Court Concord (Toronto), Ontario, L4k 2Z3 / CA Opponent's representative Stachow, Ernst-Walther Lippert, Stachow & Partner Patentanwälte Frankenforster Strasse 135-137 51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | ||
02
27.06.1996
09.07.1996
ADMISSIBLE Fränkische Rohrwerke Gebr. Kirchner Gmbh & Co. KG Hellinger Str. 1 97486 Königsberg/Bayern / DE Opponent's representative Schwabe, Hans-Georg Schwabe, Sandmair, Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | |||
Former [1996/33] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.06.1996
10.07.1996
ADMISSIBLE Corma Inc. 10 McLeary Court Concord (Toronto), Ontario, L4k 2Z3 / CA Opponent's representative Stachow, Ernst-Walther Lippert, Stachow & Partner Patentanwälte Frankenforster Strasse 135-137 51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | 30.07.1996 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 29.01.1997 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 02.03.1998 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 29.04.1998 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 09.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M08) | 20.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 12.03.2002 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.07.2002 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 24.07.2002 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 12.05.2004 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2004/53] | Appeal following opposition | 30.09.2002 | Appeal received No. T1024/02 | 04.12.2002 | Statement of grounds filed | 12.05.2004 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 12.05.2004 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.05.2004 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.02.1998 | CH | 28.02.1998 | LI | 28.02.1998 | [2000/17] |
Former [1999/01] | AT | 26.02.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2403618 (FRAENK ISOLIERROHR & METALL); | [A]FR2264649 (HEGLER WILHELM [DE]); | [A]WO8502144 (UPONOR AB [SE]); | [AD]WO8805377 (UPONOR NV [NL]); | [Y]US4846660 (DROSSBACH HUBERT M [DE]); | [YD]WO9014208 (LUPKE MANFRED ARNO ALFRED [CA]) |