EP0563581 - Filtration apparatus having stress relief groove [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.01.1997 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.03.1997 [1997/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MILLIPORE CORPORATION 80 Ashby Road Bedford Massachusetts 01730-9125 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/40] | For all designated states MILLIPORE CORPORATION 80 Ashby Road Bedford Massachusetts 01730-9125 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stankowski, Ralph J. 106 Tyngsboro Road Westford, MA 01886 / US | [1993/40] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/40] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner Möhlstrasse 37 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93103114.0 | 26.02.1993 | [1993/40] | Priority number, date | US19920843496 | 28.02.1992 Original published format: US 843496 | [1993/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0563581 | Date: | 06.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0563581 | Date: | 27.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B01D63/08, B01D29/01 | [1993/40] | CPC: |
B01D63/087 (EP,US);
B01D29/012 (EP,US);
B01D29/05 (EP);
B01D63/081 (EP,US);
B29C65/08 (EP,US);
B29C66/1312 (EP,US);
B29C66/30223 (EP,US);
B29C66/322 (EP,US);
B29C66/5412 (EP,US);
B29C66/727 (EP,US);
B29C66/71 (EP,US);
B29C66/73921 (EP,US);
B29L2031/14 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B01D29/012, B01D29/05 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2023/06 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2067/00 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2069/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/40] | Title | German: | Filtriervorrichtung mit spannungsvermindernder Nut | [1993/40] | English: | Filtration apparatus having stress relief groove | [1993/40] | French: | Appareil de filtration pourvu d'une rainure réduisant les tensions | [1993/40] | Examination procedure | 29.03.1994 | Examination requested [1994/22] | 28.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.09.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2573984 (INTERMEDICAT GMBH [CH]); | [AP]EP0503128 (CYTYC CORP [US]); | [A]DE2354269 (WEPPLER OHG); | [A]US5011555 (SAGER THOMAS B [US]) |