EP0559111 - Process for the preparation of filling materials for unpholstery elements or cushions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.02.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.03.1995 [1995/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lück, Werner Grüner Weg 6 D-46395 Bocholt / DE | [1993/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1993/36] | Representative(s) | Habbel, Hans-Georg Postfach 34 29 48019 Münster / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/36] | Habbel, Hans-Georg, Dipl.-Ing. Postfach 34 29 D-48019 Münster / DE | Application number, filing date | 93103190.0 | 27.02.1993 | [1993/36] | Priority number, date | DE19924206486 | 02.03.1992 Original published format: DE 4206486 | DE19924208982 | 20.03.1992 Original published format: DE 4208982 | [1993/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0559111 | Date: | 08.09.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0559111 | Date: | 12.01.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B68G1/00, B68G7/02 | [1994/02] | CPC: |
B68G1/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1993/36] | B68G1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1993/36] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Polster- und Kissenfüllstoffen | [1993/36] | English: | Process for the preparation of filling materials for unpholstery elements or cushions | [1993/36] | French: | Procédé de préparation de matériaux de remplissage pour rembourrage et coussins | [1993/36] | File destroyed: | 10.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 13.07.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/13] | 04.11.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1995/13] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]US3020687 (HOAGLAND) [X] 1-3 * column 4, line 33 - line 38 * [A] 5 [Y] 4; | [YA]GB431383 (J.A.HOWARD) [Y] 4 * page 1, line 6 - line 11 * * figures 7,8 * [A] 1 |