EP0560231 - Pyrazolo(3,4-a)acridine derivatives as analgesics [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.1999 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.05.1999 [1999/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST MARION ROUSSEL, INC. Kansas City, Missouri 64137-1405 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/50] | For all designated states HOECHST MARION ROUSSEL, Inc. Kansas City, Missouri 64137-1405 / US | ||
Former [1993/37] | For all designated states HOECHST-ROUSSEL PHARMACEUTICALS INCORPORATED P.O. Box 2500, Route 202-206 Somerville, NJ 08876-1258 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shutske, Gregory 21 Coppermine Village Flemington, NJ 08822 / US | 02 /
Tomer, John Dick 115 Gentry Drive Perkasie, PA 18944 / US | [1993/37] | Representative(s) | Aulmich, Gerhard, et al Hoechst AG Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Gebäude K 801 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/23] | Aulmich, Gerhard, Dr., et al Hoechst AG Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Gebäude K 801 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [1994/11] | Becker, Heinrich Karl Engelbert, Dr., et al HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Zentrale Patentabteilung Gebäude F 821 D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [1993/37] | Becker, Heinrich Karl Engelbert, Dr. HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Zentrale Patentabteilung Gebäude F 821 D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 93103604.0 | 05.03.1993 | [1993/37] | Priority number, date | US19920848558 | 09.03.1992 Original published format: US 848558 | [1993/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0560231 | Date: | 15.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0560231 | Date: | 03.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/04, A61K31/435, // (C07D471/04, 231:00, 221:00) | [1993/37] | CPC: |
C07D471/04 (EP,US);
A61P25/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1993/37] | Title | German: | Pyrazolo(3,4-a)acridinderivate als Analgetika | [1993/37] | English: | Pyrazolo(3,4-a)acridine derivatives as analgesics | [1993/37] | French: | Dérivés de la pyrazolo(3,4-a)acridine comme analgésiques | [1993/37] | Examination procedure | 03.03.1994 | Examination requested [1994/18] | 10.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.12.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0411534 (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US]); | [XP]US5179100 (SHUTSKE GREGORY M [US], et al) |