EP0560342 - Method for debugging HDL-programs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.09.1998 [1998/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/41] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/37] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ecker, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. Franz-Senn-Strasse 16 W-8000 München 70 / DE | 02 /
Gabler, Thomas, Dipl.-Ing. Goerdelerstrasse 30 w-8025 Unterhaching / DE | 03 /
Gutzki, Martin, Dipl.-Ing. Nordendstrasse 20 D-80799 München / DE | [1993/37] | Application number, filing date | 93103880.6 | 10.03.1993 | [1993/37] | Priority number, date | DE19924208162 | 13.03.1992 Original published format: DE 4208162 | [1993/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0560342 | Date: | 15.09.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0560342 | Date: | 08.10.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/00 | [1993/37] | CPC: |
G06F11/3624 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1993/37] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Untersuchen des Ablaufs eines in einer Hardware-Beschreibungssprache geschriebenen Programms | [1993/37] | English: | Method for debugging HDL-programs | [1993/37] | French: | Méthode pour le débogage de programmes HDL | [1993/37] | Examination procedure | 03.03.1994 | Examination requested [1994/18] | 14.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.03.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - 'Microsoft C Optimizing Compiler' 1987 , MICROSOFT CORPORATION , U.S. AND CANADA Language Reference |