EP0550411 - Knock control system for internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.1998 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.02.1998 [1998/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho, Kariya-City Aichi-pref., 448 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/31] | For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-City Aichi-Pref. 448 / JP | ||
Former [1997/12] | For all designated states Denso Corporation 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-City, Aichi-Pref. 448 / JP | ||
Former [1993/27] | For all designated states NIPPONDENSO CO., LTD. 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sakakibara, Koji 23, Kamiarimachi-4-chome Hekinan-shi / JP | 02 /
Hirata, Yoshihiko 5, Nadaka-1-chome Yokonemachi, Obu-shi / JP | [1993/27] | Representative(s) | Tiedtke, Harro Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/27] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93104098.4 | 12.06.1989 | [1993/27] | Priority number, date | JP19880146588 | 14.06.1988 Original published format: JP 14658888 | JP19880147885 | 15.06.1988 Original published format: JP 14788588 | [1993/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0550411 | Date: | 07.07.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0550411 | Date: | 10.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0550411 | Date: | 05.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F02P5/15, G01L23/22 | [1993/44] | CPC: |
G01L23/225 (EP,US);
F02P5/1521 (EP,US);
Y02T10/40 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1993/27] | F02P5/15 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1993/27] | Title | German: | Klopfregelung bei Brennkraftmaschinen | [1993/27] | English: | Knock control system for internal combustion engine | [1993/27] | French: | Système de commande du cliquetis dans un moteur à combustion interne | [1993/27] | Examination procedure | 28.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/27] | 12.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.07.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP89110598.3 / EP0346799 | Opposition(s) | 06.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP63138162 ; | [A]JP63036064 ; | [AD]JP62267574 ; | [A]DE3313036 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]GB2055426 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [A]US4347820 (DELERIS ROBERT); | [AD]US4617895 (SAKAKIBARA KOJI [JP], et al); | [A]US4711212 (HARAGUCHI HIROSHI [JP], et al); | [A]US4699106 (HARAGUCHI HIROSHI [JP], et al); | [A]US4711213 (SAKAKIBARA KOJI [JP], et al); | [A]GB2163812 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [A]DE2605335 (KRUPP GMBH); | [A]US4633835 (AKASU MASAHIRA [JP]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 386 (M-754)14 October 1988 & JP-A-63 138 162 ( NIPPON DENSO CO LTD ) 10 June 1988, & JP63138162 A 19880610 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 251 (M-718)15 July 1988 & JP-A-63 036 064 ( NISSAN MOTOR CO LTD ) 16 February 1988, & JP63036064 A 19880216 | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 145 (M-693)6 May 1988 & JP-A-62 267 574 ( NIPPON DENSO CO LTD ) 20 November 1987, & JP62267574 A 19871120 |