EP0554917 - Digital signal processing system having two instruction memories accessed by a processor under control of host [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1993/32] | Digital signal processor | ||
[1998/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.04.1999 [1999/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/32] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Murakami, Tokumichi, c/o MITSUBISHI DENKI K.K. Communication Sys. Dev. Lab., 1-1, Ofuna 5-chome Kamakura-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Kamizawa, Koh, c/o MITSUBISHI DENKI K.K. Communication Sys. Dev. Lab., 1-1, Ofuna 5-chome Kamakura-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 03 /
Katoh, Yoshiaki, c/o MITSUBISHI DENKI K.K. Communication Sys. Dev. Lab., 1-1, Ofuna 5-chome Kamakura-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 04 /
Ohira, Hideo, c/o MITSUBISHI DENKI K.K. Communication Sys. Dev. Lab., 1-1, Ofuna 5-chome Kamakura-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 05 /
Kameyama, Masatoshi, c/o MITSUBISHI DENKI K.K. Info. Sys. and Elec. Dev. Lab., 1-1, Ofuna 5-chome Kamakura-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 06 /
Kinjo, Naoto, c/o MITSUBISHI DENKI K.K. Communication Sys. Dev. Lab., 1-1, Ofuna 5-chome Kamakura-shi, Kanagawa / JP | [1993/32] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/32] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Martinistrasse 24 D-28195 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 93104194.1 | 01.06.1988 | [1993/32] | Priority number, date | JP19870140872 | 05.06.1987 Original published format: JP 14087287 | JP19870186858 | 27.07.1987 Original published format: JP 18685887 | JP19870197009 | 06.08.1987 Original published format: JP 19700987 | JP19870273763 | 29.10.1987 Original published format: JP 27376387 | JP19870274810 | 30.10.1987 Original published format: JP 27481087 | JP19870296611 | 25.11.1987 Original published format: JP 29661187 | JP19870296612 | 25.11.1987 Original published format: JP 29661287 | JP19870316553 | 15.12.1987 Original published format: JP 31655387 | [1993/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0554917 | Date: | 11.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0554917 | Date: | 13.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0554917 | Date: | 06.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/26, G06F15/78, G06F9/44 | [1994/12] | CPC: |
G06F7/575 (EP,US);
G06F13/28 (EP,US);
G06F15/7832 (EP,US);
G06F15/786 (EP,US);
G06F9/30058 (EP,US);
G06F9/30094 (EP,US);
G06F9/323 (EP,US);
G06F9/345 (EP,US);
G06F9/355 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1993/32] | G06F9/26, G06F15/78 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1993/32] | Title | German: | Digitales Signalverarbeitungssystem in dem ein Prozessor unter Kontrolle eines Hosts auf zwei Befehlsspeicher zugreift | [1998/19] | English: | Digital signal processing system having two instruction memories accessed by a processor under control of host | [1998/19] | French: | Système de traitement de signaux numériques comprenant un processeur accédant deux mémoires d'instruction sous contrôle d'un ordinateur hôte | [1998/19] |
Former [1993/32] | Digitaler Signalprozessor | ||
Former [1993/32] | Digital signal processor | ||
Former [1993/32] | Processeur de signaux numériques | Examination procedure | 05.09.1994 | Examination requested [1995/04] | 26.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.12.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP88108755.5 / EP0293851 | Opposition(s) | 09.02.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0073419 (ITT IND GMBH DEUTSCHE [DE], et al); | [A]US4428046 (CHARI VENU [US], et al); | [A]EP0100140 (DATA GENERAL CORP [US]) |