EP0590230 - Magnetooptical recording method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/14] | Magnetooptical recording medium | ||
[1999/24] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.05.2001 [2001/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TDK Corporation 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo-to 103 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/44] | For all designated states TDK Corporation 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo-to 103 / JP | ||
Former [1994/14] | For all designated states TDK CORPORATION 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Utsunomiya, Hajime c/o TDK Corporation, 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Kosuda, Masanori c/o TDK Corporation, 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1994/14] | Representative(s) | Vogeser, Werner, et al Hansmann & Vogeser Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 81369 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/14] | Vogeser, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Hansmann, Vogeser, Dr. Boecker, Alber, Dr. Strych, Liedl Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 D-81369 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93104261.8 | 16.03.1993 | [1994/14] | Priority number, date | JP19920285440 | 30.09.1992 Original published format: JP 28544092 | [1994/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0590230 | Date: | 06.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0590230 | Date: | 18.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0590230 | Date: | 17.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G11B11/10 | [1994/14] | CPC: |
G11B11/10584 (EP,US);
Y10S428/90 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [1994/14] | Title | German: | Magneto-optisches Aufzeichnungsverfahren | [1999/24] | English: | Magnetooptical recording method | [1999/24] | French: | Procédé d'enregistrement magnéto-optique | [1999/24] |
Former [1994/14] | Magneto-optisches Aufzeichnungsmedium | ||
Former [1994/14] | Magnetooptical recording medium | ||
Former [1994/14] | Support d'enregistrement magnéto-optique | Examination procedure | 14.11.1994 | Examination requested [1995/02] | 22.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.04.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 29.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 01.09.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS6464150 ; | [A]EP0387420 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-6,8,10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0487275 (KOMAG INC [US]) [A] 1-3,8,10 * the whole document *; | [A]JPS639047 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890622), vol. 13, no. 271, Database accession no. (P - 889), & JP01064150 A 19890310 (MATSUSHITA) [A] 1,2,8,10 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880616), vol. 12, no. 210, Database accession no. (P - 717), & JP63009047 A 00000000 (CANON) [A] 1,8 * abstract * | Examination | EP0509467 |