EP0567769 - Device for folding in the bottom-flaps of a packaging carton [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.12.1998 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tetra Laval Holdings & Finance SA Avenue Général-Guisan 70 1009 Pully / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1998/05] | For all designated states Tetra Laval Holdings & Finance SA Avenue Général-Guisan 70, P.O. Box 430 1009 Pully / CH | ||
Former [1993/48] | For all designated states Tetra Laval Holdings & Finance SA Avenue Général-Guisan 70 CH-1009 Pully / CH | ||
Former [1993/44] | For all designated states Tetra Alfa Holdings S.A. 70, Avenue Général-Guisan CH-1009 Pully / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Waldstädt, Manfred Hermann-Hesse-Strasse 50 6500Mainz 1 / DE | [1993/44] | Representative(s) | Weber, Dieter, et al Weber, Seiffert, Lieke Postfach 61 45 65051 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/44] | Weber, Dieter, Dr., et al Weber, Dieter, Dr., Seiffert, Klaus, Dipl.-Phys., Lieke, Winfried, Dr. Postfach 61 45 D-65051 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 93104624.7 | 21.03.1993 | [1993/44] | Priority number, date | DE19924214519 | 01.05.1992 Original published format: DE 4214519 | [1993/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0567769 | Date: | 03.11.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0567769 | Date: | 28.01.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B65B7/18, B65B51/22 | [1993/44] | CPC: |
B29C65/08 (EP,US);
B29C66/1122 (EP,US);
B29C66/43122 (EP,US);
B29C66/72328 (EP,US);
B29C66/80 (EP,US);
B29C66/8221 (EP,US);
B29C66/8322 (EP,US);
B29C66/8432 (EP,US);
B65B51/225 (EP,US);
B65B7/18 (EP,US);
B29C66/83241 (EP,US);
B29K2711/123 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1993/44] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Einfalten des Bodens einer Kartonpackung | [1993/44] | English: | Device for folding in the bottom-flaps of a packaging carton | [1993/44] | French: | Dispositif pour replier le fond d'un carton d'emballage | [1993/44] | Examination procedure | 14.04.1994 | Examination requested [1994/23] | 22.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 28.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 23.06.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 23.07.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 28.01.1998 | FR | 28.01.1998 | IT | 28.01.1998 | NL | 28.01.1998 | AT | 21.03.1998 | BE | 31.03.1998 | CH | 31.03.1998 | LI | 31.03.1998 | DK | 28.04.1998 | PT | 28.04.1998 | SE | 28.04.1998 | [2008/05] |
Former [2004/35] | ES | 28.01.1998 | |
FR | 28.01.1998 | ||
IT | 28.01.1998 | ||
NL | 28.01.1998 | ||
AT | 21.03.1998 | ||
BE | 31.03.1998 | ||
CH | 31.03.1998 | ||
LI | 31.03.1998 | ||
DK | 28.04.1998 | ||
PT | 28.04.1998 | ||
SE | 28.04.1998 | ||
Former [2003/45] | ES | 28.01.1998 | |
IT | 28.01.1998 | ||
NL | 28.01.1998 | ||
AT | 21.03.1998 | ||
BE | 31.03.1998 | ||
CH | 31.03.1998 | ||
LI | 31.03.1998 | ||
DK | 28.04.1998 | ||
PT | 28.04.1998 | ||
SE | 28.04.1998 | ||
FR | 26.06.1998 | ||
Former [2003/07] | ES | 28.01.1998 | |
IT | 28.01.1998 | ||
NL | 28.01.1998 | ||
AT | 21.03.1998 | ||
BE | 31.03.1998 | ||
CH | 31.03.1998 | ||
LI | 31.03.1998 | ||
PT | 28.04.1998 | ||
SE | 28.04.1998 | ||
FR | 26.06.1998 | ||
Former [2002/25] | ES | 28.01.1998 | |
IT | 28.01.1998 | ||
AT | 21.03.1998 | ||
BE | 31.03.1998 | ||
CH | 31.03.1998 | ||
LI | 31.03.1998 | ||
PT | 28.04.1998 | ||
SE | 28.04.1998 | ||
FR | 26.06.1998 | ||
Former [2000/21] | IT | 28.01.1998 | |
AT | 21.03.1998 | ||
BE | 31.03.1998 | ||
CH | 31.03.1998 | ||
LI | 31.03.1998 | ||
PT | 28.04.1998 | ||
SE | 28.04.1998 | ||
FR | 26.06.1998 | ||
Former [2000/17] | IT | 28.01.1998 | |
BE | 31.03.1998 | ||
CH | 31.03.1998 | ||
LI | 31.03.1998 | ||
PT | 28.04.1998 | ||
SE | 28.04.1998 | ||
FR | 26.06.1998 | ||
Former [1999/42] | IT | 28.01.1998 | |
BE | 31.03.1998 | ||
PT | 28.04.1998 | ||
SE | 28.04.1998 | ||
FR | 26.06.1998 | ||
Former [1999/27] | BE | 31.03.1998 | |
PT | 28.04.1998 | ||
SE | 28.04.1998 | ||
FR | 26.06.1998 | ||
Former [1998/47] | PT | 28.04.1998 | |
SE | 28.04.1998 | ||
FR | 26.06.1998 | ||
Former [1998/44] | SE | 28.04.1998 | |
FR | 26.06.1998 | ||
Former [1998/43] | SE | 28.04.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE283978 ; | [A]US2514867 (HOWARD STANLEY R, et al); | [A]DE1461787 (BERGHGRACHT MARIUS); | [A]FR2310260 (JAGENBERG WERKE AG [DE]); | [A]US3996724 (SMITH DONALD E); | [A]FR2366996 (EX CELL O CORP [US]); | [Y]GB2017041 (JAGENBERG WERKE AG) |