EP0563737 - Multilens imaging apparatus with correction of misregistration [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.07.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2004 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): LU | published on 15.09.2004 [2004/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/40] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Katayama, Tatsushi, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146 / JP | 02 /
Niwa, Yukichi, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146 / JP | 03 /
Suda, Shigeyuki, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146 / JP | [1993/40] | Representative(s) | Bühling, Gerhard, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/40] | Bühling, Gerhard, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93104677.5 | 22.03.1993 | [1993/40] | Priority number, date | JP19920065170 | 23.03.1992 Original published format: JP 6517092 | JP19920152214 | 11.06.1992 Original published format: JP 15221492 | JP19920158118 | 17.06.1992 Original published format: JP 15811892 | [1993/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0563737 | Date: | 06.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0563737 | Date: | 10.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H04N13/02, H04N3/23 | [1993/40] | CPC: |
G06T3/147 (EP,US);
H04N13/239 (EP,US);
H04N13/246 (EP,US);
H04N13/296 (EP,US);
H04N3/2335 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10012 (EP,US);
H04N13/111 (EP,US);
H04N13/117 (EP,US);
H04N13/189 (EP,US);
H04N13/194 (EP,US);
H04N13/257 (EP,US);
H04N13/293 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1993/40] | Title | German: | Bildaufnahmevorrichtung mit mehreren Linsen und Korrektur von Falschregistrierung | [1993/40] | English: | Multilens imaging apparatus with correction of misregistration | [1993/40] | French: | Appareil de prise de vues multi-lentilles avec correction de désalignement | [1993/40] | Examination procedure | 16.02.1994 | Examination requested [1994/15] | 26.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.09.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.03.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.06.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.09.1997 | BE | 10.09.1997 | CH | 10.09.1997 | DK | 10.09.1997 | ES | 10.09.1997 | GR | 10.09.1997 | LI | 10.09.1997 | NL | 10.09.1997 | PT | 10.12.1997 | SE | 10.12.1997 | IE | 22.03.1998 | LU | 22.03.1998 | [2004/38] |
Former [2003/07] | AT | 10.09.1997 | |
BE | 10.09.1997 | ||
CH | 10.09.1997 | ||
DK | 10.09.1997 | ||
ES | 10.09.1997 | ||
GR | 10.09.1997 | ||
LI | 10.09.1997 | ||
NL | 10.09.1997 | ||
PT | 10.12.1997 | ||
SE | 10.12.1997 | ||
IE | 22.03.1998 | ||
LU | 31.03.1998 | ||
Former [2003/05] | AT | 10.09.1997 | |
BE | 10.09.1997 | ||
CH | 10.09.1997 | ||
DK | 10.09.1997 | ||
ES | 10.09.1997 | ||
GR | 10.09.1997 | ||
LI | 10.09.1997 | ||
PT | 10.12.1997 | ||
SE | 10.12.1997 | ||
IE | 22.03.1998 | ||
LU | 31.03.1998 | ||
Former [2002/25] | AT | 10.09.1997 | |
BE | 10.09.1997 | ||
CH | 10.09.1997 | ||
DK | 10.09.1997 | ||
ES | 10.09.1997 | ||
GR | 10.09.1997 | ||
IE | 10.09.1997 | ||
LI | 10.09.1997 | ||
PT | 10.12.1997 | ||
SE | 10.12.1997 | ||
LU | 31.03.1998 | ||
Former [2002/10] | AT | 10.09.1997 | |
BE | 10.09.1997 | ||
CH | 10.09.1997 | ||
DK | 10.09.1997 | ||
GR | 10.09.1997 | ||
IE | 10.09.1997 | ||
LI | 10.09.1997 | ||
PT | 10.12.1997 | ||
SE | 10.12.1997 | ||
LU | 31.03.1998 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 10.09.1997 | |
BE | 10.09.1997 | ||
CH | 10.09.1997 | ||
DK | 10.09.1997 | ||
GR | 10.09.1997 | ||
LI | 10.09.1997 | ||
PT | 10.12.1997 | ||
SE | 10.12.1997 | ||
LU | 31.03.1998 | ||
Former [1998/30] | AT | 10.09.1997 | |
BE | 10.09.1997 | ||
CH | 10.09.1997 | ||
DK | 10.09.1997 | ||
LI | 10.09.1997 | ||
PT | 10.12.1997 | ||
SE | 10.12.1997 | ||
Former [1998/24] | AT | 10.09.1997 | |
BE | 10.09.1997 | ||
CH | 10.09.1997 | ||
LI | 10.09.1997 | ||
PT | 10.12.1997 | ||
SE | 10.12.1997 | ||
Former [1998/21] | AT | 10.09.1997 | |
BE | 10.09.1997 | ||
CH | 10.09.1997 | ||
LI | 10.09.1997 | ||
SE | 10.12.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 10.09.1997 | |
CH | 10.09.1997 | ||
LI | 10.09.1997 | ||
SE | 10.12.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP56169968 ; | [A]JP58051682 ; | [A]JP55004192 ; | [A]EP0011677 (GRUNDIG EMV [DE]); | [Y]US4667236 (DRESDNER DANIEL [US]); | [A]EP0231654 (PILKINGTON PERKIN ELMER LTD [GB]); | [A]EP0248730 (THOMSON CSF [FR]); | [Y]EP0332403 (SHARP KK [JP]); | [Y]EP0335004 (MURAKAMI KANJI); | [X]GB2226923 (TOH PENG SENG, et al); | [AP]GB2250604 (TOH PENG SENG, et al) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 6, no. 55 (E-101)10 April 1982 & JP-A-56 169 968 ( HITASHI DENSHI LTD ) 26 December 1981, & JP56169968 A 19811226 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 7, no. 136 (E-181)(1281) 14 June 1983 & JP-A-58 051 682 ( HITASHI DENSHI K.K. ) 26 March 1983, & JP58051682 A 19830326 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 4, no. 32 (E-2)19 March 1980 & JP-A-55 004 192 ( MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. ) 12 January 1980, & JP55004192 A 19800112 | [A] - SECOND INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION December 1988, TAMPA, FLORIDA, USA pages 123 - 128 TAKAHASHI ET AL. 'Self-calibration of stereo cameras' |