Cited in | Search | Type: | Patent literature | Publication No.: | JP56169968
[Y] ; | Type: | Patent literature | Publication No.: | JP58051682
[A] ; | Type: | Patent literature | Publication No.: | JP55004192
[A] ; | Type: | Patent literature | Publication No.: | EP0011677
[A] (GRUNDIG EMV [DE]); | Type: | Patent literature | Publication No.: | US4667236
[Y] (DRESDNER DANIEL [US]); | Type: | Patent literature | Publication No.: | EP0231654
[A] (PILKINGTON PERKIN ELMER LTD [GB]); | Type: | Patent literature | Publication No.: | EP0248730
[A] (THOMSON CSF [FR]); | Type: | Patent literature | Publication No.: | EP0332403
[Y] (SHARP KK [JP]); | Type: | Patent literature | Publication No.: | EP0335004
[Y] (MURAKAMI KANJI); | Type: | Patent literature | Publication No.: | GB2226923
[X] (TOH PENG SENG, et al); | Type: | Patent literature | Publication No.: | GB2250604
[AP] (TOH PENG SENG, et al) | Type: | Non-patent literature | Publication information: | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 6, no. 55 (E-101)10 April 1982 & JP-A-56 169 968 ( HITASHI DENSHI LTD ) 26 December 1981, & JP56169968 A 19811226 | Type: | Non-patent literature | Publication information: | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 7, no. 136 (E-181)(1281) 14 June 1983 & JP-A-58 051 682 ( HITASHI DENSHI K.K. ) 26 March 1983, & JP58051682 A 19830326 | Type: | Non-patent literature | Publication information: | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 4, no. 32 (E-2)19 March 1980 & JP-A-55 004 192 ( MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. ) 12 January 1980, & JP55004192 A 19800112 | Type: | Non-patent literature | Publication information: | [A] - SECOND INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION December 1988, TAMPA, FLORIDA, USA pages 123 - 128 TAKAHASHI ET AL. 'Self-calibration of stereo cameras' |