Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2957375B | Global Dossier | 04.10.1999 | B2 | JPH06111056 | 22.04.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | US87012992 | 15.04.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0565911 | Global Dossier | 24.08.1994 | A3 | EP0565911 | 20.10.1993 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US87012992 | 15.04.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5251273 | 05.10.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | US87012992 | 15.04.1992 |