EP0564901 - Feeding device for panels [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.10.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Krupp Kunststofftechnik GmbH Helenenstrasse 149 45143 Essen / DE | [1997/25] |
Former [1993/41] | For all designated states KRUPP MASCHINENTECHNIK GESELLSCHAFT MIT BESCHRÄNKTER HAFTUNG Helenenstrasse 149 D-45143 Essen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lentz, Norbert, Dr.-Ing. Ostpreussenstrasse 82 W-4300 Essen 15 / DE | 02 /
Schmidt, Harald, Dipl.-Ing. Kapellenstrasse 49 W-5163 Langerwehe / DE | [1993/41] | Application number, filing date | 93104838.3 | 24.03.1993 | [1993/41] | Priority number, date | DE19924211658 | 07.04.1992 Original published format: DE 4211658 | [1993/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0564901 | Date: | 13.10.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0564901 | Date: | 09.03.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0564901 | Date: | 26.11.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B23D33/02 | [1993/41] | CPC: |
B65H9/14 (EP,US);
B65G17/26 (KR);
B23D33/02 (EP,US);
B23Q7/007 (EP,US);
B65H2404/232 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1993/41] | Title | German: | Vorschubeinrichtung für Tafeln | [1993/41] | English: | Feeding device for panels | [1993/41] | French: | Dispositif d'avance pour tôle | [1993/41] | Examination procedure | 23.08.1994 | Examination requested [1994/42] | 04.02.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.05.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.08.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1996 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   05.06.1996 | 31.03.1997 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   28.05.1997 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 26.11.1997 | SE | 26.02.1998 | [2003/07] |
Former [1998/35] | SE | 26.02.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | US1868707 [ ] (HOTHERSALL JOHN M); | US2355079 [ ] (JONES LYMAN L); | US2484845 [ ] (NORDQUIST RONALD E J, et al); | US2547964 [ ] (NORDQUIST RONALD E J, et al); | US4586612 [ ] (OBERG HANS [CA]); | WO9106408 [ ] (MARLEY UK LIMITED [GB], et al) | Examination | US2554095 | US2623746 | US2769528 | FR1490870 | DE2425948 | EP0095955 |