EP0563796 - Satin-matt, biaxially orientated polyolefin multilayer film, process for its manufacture, and use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 22.06.2001 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2001 | Opposition rejected | published on 08.08.2001 [2001/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Trespaphan GmbH Bergstrasse 66539 Neunkirchen / DE | [2000/42] |
Former [1998/17] | For all designated states Hoechst Trespaphan GmbH Bergstrasse 66539 Neunkirchen / DE | ||
Former [1998/05] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [1993/40] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Murschall, Ursula, Dr. Im Bacchuswinkel 11 W-6505 Nierstein / DE | 02 /
Speith, Angela An den Reben 27 W-6500 Mainz / DE | 03 /
Schlögl, Gunter, Dr. Finkenweg 2 W-6233 Kelkheim / DE | [1993/40] | Representative(s) | Mai, Oppermann & Partner i.L. Patentanwälte Postfach 3929 65029 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/17] | Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner GbR Patentanwälte, Postfach 3929 65029 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 93104971.2 | 25.03.1993 | [1993/40] | Priority number, date | DE19924210969 | 02.04.1992 Original published format: DE 4210969 | [1993/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0563796 | Date: | 06.10.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0563796 | Date: | 28.01.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/32 | [1993/40] | CPC: |
B32B27/32 (EP,US);
B32B27/08 (US);
B32B27/18 (US);
C08L23/04 (EP,US);
C08L23/10 (EP,US);
C08L23/12 (EP,US);
C08L23/14 (EP,US);
C08L23/142 (EP,US);
B29K2995/0072 (EP,US);
B32B2307/718 (US);
B32B2307/746 (US);
B32B2323/043 (US);
C08L2205/02 (EP,US);
C08L2205/03 (EP,US);
C08L23/06 (EP,US);
Y10S428/91 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1352 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1359 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2826 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31692 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31895 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31913 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L23/04, C08L2666/04 (US,EP);
C08L23/10, C08L2666/04 (US,EP);
C08L23/12, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C08L23/12, C08L2666/06 (US,EP);
C08L23/142, C08L2666/02 (EP,US);
C08L23/142, C08L2666/06 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1993/40] | Title | German: | Seidenmatte, biaxial orientierte Polyolefin-Mehrschichtfolie, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und ihre Verwendung | [1993/40] | English: | Satin-matt, biaxially orientated polyolefin multilayer film, process for its manufacture, and use | [1993/40] | French: | Film multicouche en polyoléfine, biaxialement orienté et à surface matte-satinée, procédé de sa fabrication et usage | [1993/40] | Examination procedure | 17.03.1994 | Examination requested [1994/19] | 19.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.07.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 04.11.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.11.2000 | Observations by third parties | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
28.10.1998
ADMISSIBLE Wolff Walsrode AG Postfach D-29655 Walsrode / DE Opponent's representative Hellfeldt, Kurt, et al, et al Bayer AG Konzernbereich RP Patente und Lizenzen 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/51] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
28.10.1998
ADMISSIBLE Wolff Walsrode AG Postfach D-29655 Walsrode / DE Opponent's representative Hellfeldt, Kurt, Dr., et al, et al Bayer AG Konzernbereich RP, Patente und Lizenzen 51368 Leverkusen / DE | 03.12.1998 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 14.06.1999 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 25.01.2001 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2001/32] | 25.01.2001 | Date of oral proceedings | 01.03.2001 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 01.03.2001 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [1999/30] |
Former [1999/02] | GB | 28.01.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0011796 (HOECHST AG [DE]); | [X]EP0122495 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]); | [AD]US4578316 (CLAUSON MELVIL B [US], et al); | [A]EP0365463 (JAMES RIVER PAPER CO [US]); | [A]EP0394550 (NITTO DENKO CORP [JP]); | [E]EP0538746 (HOECHST AG [DE]) | other | JPS581525 | US4578316 | EP0312289 | EP0367613 |