blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0563814

EP0563814 - Carbonic acid esters of 2-amino-7-(1,3-dihydroxy-2-propoxymethyl)purines, their preparation and their use as antiviral agents [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2000
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip03.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.12.2000 [2000/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[2000/01]
Former [1993/40]For all designated states
HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Jähne, Gerhard, Dr.
Johannesallee 14
W-6230 Frankfurt am Main / DE
02 / Helsberg, Matthias, Dr.
Am Rosengarten 3
W-6233 Kelkheim/Ts. / DE
03 / Winkler, Irvin, Dr.
In den Eichen 40
W-6237 Liederbach / DE
04 / Gross, Gerhard, Dr.
Kapellenstrasse 27
W-6093 Flörsheim am Main / DE
05 / Scholl, Thomas, Dr.
Erste Fährgasse 3
W-5300 Bonn / DE
[1993/40]
Application number, filing date93105011.626.03.1993
[1993/40]
Priority number, dateDE1992421022128.03.1992         Original published format: DE 4210221
[1993/40]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0563814
Date:06.10.1993
Language:DE
[1993/40]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0563814
Date:19.01.1994
Language:DE
[1994/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0563814
Date:05.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.12.1993
ClassificationIPC:C07D473/32, A61K31/52
[1993/40]
CPC:
C07D473/32 (EP); C07D487/04 (KR); A61P31/12 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1993/40]
TitleGerman:Carbonsäureester von 2-Amino-7-(1,3-dihydroxy-2-propoxymethyl)purin, deren Herstellung sowie deren Verwendung als antivirales Mittel[1993/40]
English:Carbonic acid esters of 2-amino-7-(1,3-dihydroxy-2-propoxymethyl)purines, their preparation and their use as antiviral agents[1993/40]
French:Esters d'acide carbonique de 2-amino-7-(1,3-dihydroxy-2-propoxyméthyl)purines, leur préparation et leur utilisation comme agents antiviraux[1993/40]
Examination procedure18.07.1994Examination requested  [1994/37]
06.10.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.05.1998Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
28.07.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.11.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.05.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.08.1999Fee for grant paid
24.08.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51]
Request for further processing for:24.07.1998Request for further processing filed
24.07.1998Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
25.08.1998Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
01.04.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
01.04.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[DA]EP0452680  (HOECHST AG [DE])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.