EP0569707 - Cyclic carbonate compounds, method for producing the same and positive photoresist composition using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.08.1997 [1997/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY LIMITED 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0041 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/38] | For all designated states SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY LIMITED 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541 / JP | ||
Former [1993/46] | For all designated states SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY, LIMITED 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ueda, Yuji 171-26, Ikegamicho Izumi-shi / JP | 02 /
Takeyama, Naoki 2-43, Shoya-2-chome Settsu-shi / JP | 03 /
Ueki, Hiromi 3-3-401, Wakayamadai-1-chome Shimamotocho, Mishima-gun / JP | 04 /
Kusumoto, Takehiro 14-7, Mefu-2-chome Takarazuka-shi / JP | [1993/46] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/52] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/46] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER P.O. Box 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93105822.6 | 08.04.1993 | [1993/46] | Priority number, date | JP19920090770 | 10.04.1992 Original published format: JP 9077092 | JP19930005792 | 18.01.1993 Original published format: JP 579293 | [1993/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0569707 | Date: | 18.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0569707 | Date: | 05.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0569707 | Date: | 14.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C07C69/96, C07C68/06, G03F7/039 | [1993/46] | CPC: |
C07C69/96 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/0045 (EP,KR,US);
Y10S430/106 (EP,US);
Y10S430/11 (EP,KR,US);
Y10S430/121 (EP,KR,US);
Y10S430/122 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1993/46] | Title | German: | Cyklische Carbonatverbindung, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und diese enthaltende positive-arbeitende Photoresistzusammensetzung | [1996/33] | English: | Cyclic carbonate compounds, method for producing the same and positive photoresist composition using the same | [1993/46] | French: | Composés carbonates cycliques, leur méthode de préparation et composition photorésistive positive les utilisant | [1996/33] |
Former [1993/46] | Zyklische Karbonatverbindungen, ihr Herstellungsverfahren und diese enthaltende Photoresistcompositionen | ||
Former [1993/46] | Composés carbonates cycliques, leur méthode de préparation et composition photorésistive les utilisant | Examination procedure | 01.06.1994 | Examination requested [1994/31] | 04.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 09.01.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 16.01.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.05.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No relevant documents disclosed |