EP0566035 - Device for separating dispers liquid-liquid and liquid-solid systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): IE | published on 06.03.2002 [2002/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dyckerhoff & Widmann Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 81 02 80 D-81902 München / DE | [1993/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | 02 /
* * * | [1993/42] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Dr. Keller, Schwertfeger Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 20 80 76810 Landau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/42] | Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. F.W. Möll Dipl.-Ing. H.Ch. Bitterich Postfach 20 80 D-76810 Landau / DE | Application number, filing date | 93105842.4 | 08.04.1993 | [1993/42] | Priority number, date | DE19924212449 | 14.04.1992 Original published format: DE 4212449 | [1993/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0566035 | Date: | 20.10.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0566035 | Date: | 19.04.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B01D17/028, B01D17/04 | [1993/42] | CPC: |
B01D17/0211 (EP);
B01D17/045 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1993/42] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Trennen von dispersen Flüssig-Flüssig- und Flüssig-Fest-Stoffsystemen | [1993/42] | English: | Device for separating dispers liquid-liquid and liquid-solid systems | [1993/42] | French: | Dispositif pour séparer des systèmes dispersés liquide-liquide et liquide-solide | [1993/42] | Examination procedure | 07.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/42] | 29.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 19.04.1995 | PT | 19.07.1995 | SE | 19.07.1995 | IE | 01.11.1995 | [2002/10] |
Former [1999/16] | GB | 19.04.1995 | |
IE | 19.04.1995 | ||
PT | 19.07.1995 | ||
SE | 19.07.1995 | ||
Former [1998/14] | GB | 19.04.1995 | |
PT | 19.07.1995 | ||
SE | 19.07.1995 | ||
Former [1996/04] | GB | 19.04.1995 | |
SE | 19.07.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1758743 (FLOYD HARMAN JAY); | [AD]DE1169895 (BOEWE BOEHLER & WEBER K G MASC); | [A]US3152196 (WILLIAM MARZIANI ALEXANDER); | [A]US3957656 (CASTELLI JOSEPH L); | [AD]DE3824295 (PREUSSAG AG BAUWESEN [DE]) |