Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] |
25.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.06.1997 [1997/24] |
03.05.1996 | (Expected) grant | published on 19.06.1996 [1996/25] |
23.04.1996 | Renewal fee | |
12.04.1996 | Change - applicant | published on 29.05.1996 [1996/22] |
12.04.1996 | Change - representative | published on 29.05.1996 [1996/22] |
29.02.1996 | Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
18.10.1994 | First examination report | |
16.02.1994 | Request for examination filed | published on 06.04.1994 [1994/14] |
29.10.1993 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 15.12.1993 [1993/50] |