EP0573755 - Insulation system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.04.1997 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. MISSEL GmbH Hortensienweg 2 und 27 D-70374 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/22] | For all designated states E. Missel GmbH Hortensienweg 2 und 27 D-70374 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1993/50] | For all designated states E. Missel GmbH & Co. Hortensienweg 2 und 27 D-70374 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schäfer, Wolfgang Endersbacher Strasse 51 W-7000 Stuttgart 50 / DE | [1993/50] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/50] | Dipl.-Phys.Dr. Manitz Dipl.-Ing. Finsterwald Dipl.-Ing. Grämkow Dipl.Chem.Dr. Heyn Dipl.Phys. Rotermund Morgan, B.Sc.(Phys.) Postfach 22 16 11 D-80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93105864.8 | 08.04.1993 | [1993/50] | Priority number, date | DE19924219305 | 12.06.1992 Original published format: DE 4219305 | [1993/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0573755 | Date: | 15.12.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0573755 | Date: | 19.06.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F16L3/00, F16L59/14, F24D3/14 | [1993/50] | CPC: |
F16L59/143 (EP);
F16L3/006 (EP);
F24D3/141 (EP);
Y02B30/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, LU, NL [1993/50] | Title | German: | Dämmsystem | [1993/50] | English: | Insulation system | [1993/50] | French: | Système isolant | [1993/50] | Examination procedure | 03.02.1994 | Examination requested [1994/14] | 21.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.11.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH596517 (FEIST ARTUS); | [A]EP0010639 (NORDROHR KUNSTSTOFF ROHREN UND [DE]); | [Y]EP0158188 ; | [A]DE8904093U ; | [A]EP0426539 (CERIB [FR]); | [Y]WO9110866 (STRAMAX AG [CH]) |