EP0566042 - Jet part pipette [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.02.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.04.1997 [1997/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LABSYSTEMS OY CORPORATION PL 8 00881 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [1993/42] | For all designated states LABSYSTEMS OY CORPORATION PL 8 SF-00881 Helsinki / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heinonen, Mauno Valliraitti 7 C 16 SF-01280 Vantaa / FI | [1993/42] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/42] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 D-81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93105873.9 | 08.04.1993 | [1993/42] | Priority number, date | FI19920001647 | 13.04.1992 Original published format: FI 921647 | [1993/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0566042 | Date: | 20.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/02 | [1993/42] | CPC: |
B01L3/021 (EP,US);
B01L3/0275 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/42] | Title | German: | Pipettiervorrichtung | [1993/42] | English: | Jet part pipette | [1993/42] | French: | Pipette | [1993/42] | Examination procedure | 16.03.1994 | Examination requested [1994/19] | 19.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/15] | 07.11.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1997/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1996 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]JP04150862 ; | [A]US4933148 (PERLMAN DANIEL [US]); | [A]US4671123 (MAGNUSSEN JR HAAKON T [US], et al); | [A]GB2161398 (SCIENT SUPPLIES M B); | [A]FR1431477 (EPPENDORF GERAETEBAU NETHELER) | [AP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 16, no. 437 (C-0984)11 September 1992 & JP-A-04 150862 ( KAWASHIMA KK ) 25 May 1992, & JP04150862 A 19920525 |