EP0566107 - Optical information recording medium and method of designing its structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.01.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [1993/42] | For all designated states Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. 1008, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamada, Noboru 1-4-2, Kuzuhaoka Hirakata-shi, Osaka / JP | 02 /
Akahira, Nobuo 13-6, Otokoyama Kanaburi Yawata-shi, Kyoto / JP | 03 /
Nishiuchi, Kenichi 2-29-15-508, Okubo-cho Moriguchi-shi, Osaka / JP | 04 /
Nagata, Kenichi 12-7, Kamino-cho Nishinomiya-shi, Hyogo / JP | 05 /
Ohno, Eiji 1-4-15, Himurodai Hirakata-shi, Osaka / JP | 06 /
Furukawa, Shigeaki 949-1, Handa, Kawanishi-cho Shiki-gun, Nara / JP | [1993/42] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/42] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Martinistrasse 24 D-28195 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 93106103.0 | 15.04.1993 | [1993/42] | Priority number, date | JP19920097606 | 17.04.1992 Original published format: JP 9760692 | JP19920097607 | 17.04.1992 Original published format: JP 9760792 | JP19920157730 | 17.06.1992 Original published format: JP 15773092 | [1993/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0566107 | Date: | 20.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0566107 | Date: | 18.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/24, G11B7/00 | [1993/42] | CPC: |
G11B7/006 (EP,US);
G11B7/24 (EP,US);
Y10S428/913 (EP,US);
Y10S430/146 (EP,US);
Y10T428/21 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31678 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1993/42] | Title | German: | Optisches Informationsaufzeichnungsmedium und Verfahren zum Entwurf seiner Struktur | [1993/42] | English: | Optical information recording medium and method of designing its structure | [1993/42] | French: | Milieu d'enregistrement d'information optique et procédé de conception de sa structure | [1993/42] | Examination procedure | 15.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/42] | 14.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.09.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.12.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP03113844 ; | [A]EP0347801 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | [AD]EP0319037 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0466670 (IBM [US]) | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 15, no. 316 (P-1237)13 August 1991 & JP-A-03 113 844 ( ASAHI CHEM IND CO ) 15 May 1991, & JP03113844 A 19910515 | Examination | EP0251286 |