EP0567863 - Casement stay particularly for turnable and tiltable wings of windows [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Niemann, Hans-Dieter Am Hügel 17 50169 Kerpen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/44] | For all designated states Niemann, Hans-Dieter Am Hügel 17 D-50169 Kerpen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1993/44] | Representative(s) | Eichler, Peter Sturies - Eichler - Füssel Patentanwälte, Lönsstrasse 55 42289 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/35] | Eichler, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. Sturies - Eichler - Füssel Patentanwälte, Brahmsstrasse 29 42289 Wuppertal / DE | ||
Former [1994/49] | Eichler, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Postfach 20 18 31 D-42218 Wuppertal / DE | ||
Former [1993/44] | Sturies, Herbert Patentanwälte Dr.-Ing. Dipl.-Phys. Herbert Sturies Dipl.-Ing. Peter Eichler Postfach 20 18 31 D-42218 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 93106186.5 | 16.04.1993 | [1993/44] | Priority number, date | DE19920005734U | 29.04.1992 Original published format: DE 9205734 U | [1993/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0567863 | Date: | 03.11.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0567863 | Date: | 19.01.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0567863 | Date: | 22.05.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | E05C17/18 | [1993/44] | CPC: |
E05C17/045 (EP);
E05C17/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1993/44] | Title | German: | Flügelfeststeller, insbesondere für Dreh-Kipp-Fensterflügel | [1993/44] | English: | Casement stay particularly for turnable and tiltable wings of windows | [1993/44] | French: | Bloqueur d'aile notamment pour ailes de fenêtres rotatives et basculantes | [1993/44] | Examination procedure | 16.02.1994 | Examination requested [1994/16] | 22.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.11.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 22.05.1996 | DK | 22.05.1996 | ES | 22.05.1996 | FR | 22.05.1996 | GB | 22.05.1996 | IT | 22.05.1996 | [2006/14] |
Former [2002/25] | BE | 22.05.1996 | |
DK | 22.05.1996 | ||
ES | 22.05.1996 | ||
GB | 22.05.1996 | ||
IT | 22.05.1996 | ||
FR | 18.10.1996 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 22.05.1996 | |
DK | 22.05.1996 | ||
GB | 22.05.1996 | ||
IT | 22.05.1996 | ||
FR | 18.10.1996 | ||
Former [1998/15] | BE | 22.05.1996 | |
DK | 22.05.1996 | ||
GB | 22.05.1996 | ||
FR | 18.10.1996 | ||
Former [1997/21] | BE | 22.05.1996 | |
GB | 22.05.1996 | ||
FR | 18.10.1996 | ||
Former [1997/17] | GB | 22.05.1996 | |
FR | 18.10.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2225055 ; | [A]GB1500194 (SANDBERG V); | [A]DD278617 (BAUELEMENTE FASERBAUSTOFFE VEB [DD]) |