EP0568847 - Device for conveying sheets in a printing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.04.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG Christian-Pless-Strasse 6-30 63012 Offenbach/Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/45] | For all designated states MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG Christian-Pless-Strasse 6-30 D-63012 Offenbach/Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Emrich, Helmut Neckarstrasse 31 W-6050 Offenbach/Main / DE | 02 /
Guba, Reinhold Müllerstrasse 18a W-6100 Darmstadt / DE | [1993/45] | Representative(s) | Marek, Joachim c/o MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG Patentabteilung/FTB S, Postfach 10 12 64 63012 Offenbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/45] | Marek, Joachim, Dipl.-Ing. c/o MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG Patentabteilung/FTB S, Postfach 10 12 64 D-63012 Offenbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 93106207.9 | 16.04.1993 | [1993/45] | Priority number, date | DE19924214604 | 08.05.1992 Original published format: DE 4214604 | [1993/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0568847 | Date: | 10.11.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0568847 | Date: | 19.06.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B41F21/08, B65H29/04 | [1993/45] | CPC: |
B65H29/041 (EP,US);
B65H29/042 (EP,US);
B65H2801/21 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1993/45] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Transport von Bogen innerhalb einer Druckmaschine | [1993/45] | English: | Device for conveying sheets in a printing machine | [1993/45] | French: | Dispositif pour transporter des feuilles dans une machine à imprimer | [1993/45] | Examination procedure | 28.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/45] | 10.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.11.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 19.06.1996 | ES | 19.06.1996 | GR | 19.06.1996 | PT | 19.09.1996 | IE | 06.03.1997 | [2002/25] |
Former [2002/10] | DK | 19.06.1996 | |
GR | 19.06.1996 | ||
PT | 19.09.1996 | ||
IE | 06.03.1997 | ||
Former [2000/05] | DK | 19.06.1996 | |
GR | 19.06.1996 | ||
IE | 19.06.1996 | ||
PT | 19.09.1996 | ||
Former [1999/16] | DK | 19.06.1996 | |
IE | 19.06.1996 | ||
PT | 19.09.1996 | ||
Former [1998/15] | DK | 19.06.1996 | |
PT | 19.09.1996 | ||
Former [1997/22] | PT | 19.09.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2620033 (WOOD JAMES R); | [X]US2730363 (PAUL DIETRICH, et al); | [X]FR1426449 (DRUCKMASCHINENWERK VICTORIA VE) |