EP0567028 - Straight through lateral constraint [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1993/43] | Straight through lateral contraint | ||
[1996/26] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.05.1997 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.06.1997 [1997/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/43] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Morse, John Edwin, c/o Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 02 /
Bunting, Leslie, c/o Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | [1993/43] | Representative(s) | Blickle, K. Werner, et al KODAK AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Patentabteilung 70323 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/43] | Blickle, K. Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al KODAK AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Patentabteilung D-70323 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 93106282.2 | 17.04.1993 | [1993/43] | Priority number, date | US19920874144 | 24.04.1992 Original published format: US 874144 | [1993/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0567028 | Date: | 27.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0567028 | Date: | 26.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G03B27/62, B65H9/16, B65H23/02 | [1993/43] | CPC: |
B65H23/02 (EP,US);
B65H23/032 (EP,US);
G03B1/46 (EP,US);
G03B27/6285 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1993/43] | Title | German: | Geradliniger seitlicher Anschlag | [1993/43] | English: | Straight through lateral constraint | [1996/26] | French: | Butée latérale en ligne droite | [1993/43] |
Former [1993/43] | Straight through lateral contraint | Examination procedure | 07.04.1994 | Examination requested [1994/22] | 04.08.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.12.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3929327 (OLSON LORIN P); | [A]US3469917 (PIGNONE JOSEPH); | [A]US5031894 (BEDZYK MARK D [US], et al); | [A]EP0085457 (OCE NEDERLAND BV [NL]); | [A]EP0348897 (SKODA KP [CS]) |