Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
23.08.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.10.1996 [1996/41] |
10.05.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | |
24.05.1995 | Publication of search report | published on 12.07.1995 [1995/28] |
13.05.1995 | Change - classification | published on 05.07.1995 [1995/27] |
10.03.1994 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 27.04.1994 [1994/17] |