EP0573760 - Method for identifying speech and call-progression signals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1993/50] | Apparatus and method for identifying speech and call-progression signals | ||
[1995/35] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.08.1996 [1996/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VMX INC. 2115 O'Nel Drive San Jose California 95131 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/50] | For all designated states VMX INC. 2115 O'Nel Drive San Jose, California 95131 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eatamar, Drory 3585 Shafer Drive Santa Clara, California 95051 / US | [1993/50] | Representative(s) | Schmidt, Steffen J. Patentanwalt Steffen J. Schmidt Kazmairstrasse 26 Postfach 12 14 27 80036 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/50] | Schmidt, Steffen J. Patentanwalt Steffen J. Schmidt, Kazmairstrasse 26, Postfach 12 14 27 D-80036 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93106482.8 | 21.04.1993 | [1993/50] | Priority number, date | US19920889513 | 26.05.1992 Original published format: US 889513 | [1993/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0573760 | Date: | 15.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0573760 | Date: | 30.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/00 | [1993/50] | CPC: |
H04Q1/46 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/50] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Identifizieren von Sprach- und Rufverlaufsignalen | [1995/35] | English: | Method for identifying speech and call-progression signals | [1995/35] | French: | Méthode pour l'identification des signaux de parole et de progression d'appel | [1995/35] |
Former [1993/50] | Einrichtung und Verfahren zum Identifizieren von Sprach- und Rufverlaufsignalen | ||
Former [1993/50] | Apparatus and method for identifying speech and call-progression signals | ||
Former [1993/50] | Dispositif et méthode pour l'identification des signaux de parole et de progression d'appel | Examination procedure | 21.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/50] | 09.11.1994 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 15.12.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.12.1994 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 06.03.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3944753 (PROCTOR DARRYL F, et al); | [A]DE3101851 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | [A]US4439639 (MUNTER ERNST A [CA]) |