EP0567104 - Semiconductor memory device having a self-refresh function [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1993/43] | Circuit for detecting refresh address signals of a semiconductor memory device | ||
[1998/27] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.05.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.06.1999 [1999/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-3 Dong Paldal-gu Suwon City, Kyungki-do 441-373 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/43] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416 Maetan-3 Dong, Paldal-ku Suwon-city, Kyungki-do 441-373 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kang, Kyung-Woo 1172-15, Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-city, Kyungki-do / KR | [1993/43] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/43] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93106502.3 | 21.04.1993 | [1993/43] | Priority number, date | KR19670002892 | 22.04.1992 Original published format: KR 672892 | [1993/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0567104 | Date: | 27.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0567104 | Date: | 17.04.1996 | [1996/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0567104 | Date: | 01.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G11C29/00, G11C11/406 | [1996/15] | CPC: |
G11C29/02 (EP,US);
G11C11/406 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [1993/43] | G11C29/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1993/43] | Title | German: | Halbleiterspeichervorrichtung mit Selbstauffrischungsfunktion | [1998/27] | English: | Semiconductor memory device having a self-refresh function | [1998/27] | French: | Dispositif de mémoire à semi-conducteurs possédant un rafraîchissement propre | [1998/27] |
Former [1993/43] | Schaltung zur Erkennung von Auffrischungadressignalen eines Halbleiterspeichersgeräts | ||
Former [1993/43] | Circuit for detecting refresh address signals of a semiconductor memory device | ||
Former [1993/43] | Circuit de détection de signaux d'adresse de rafraîchissement d'un dispositif de mémoire à semi-conducteurs | Examination procedure | 30.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/39] | 17.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.11.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4672583 (NAKAIZUMI KAZUO [JP]) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * column 5, line 48 - column 8, line 23 *; | [A]US4933908 (BYERS LARRY L [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * abstract ** column 4, line 42 - column 5, line 2; claims 1-4 * |