EP0569758 - Method and apparatus for creating and storing three-dimensional font characters and performing three-dimensional typesetting [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.10.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.1998 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.12.1998 [1998/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/46] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ellson, Richard N., c/o EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 02 /
Ray, Lawrence Allen, c/o EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | [1993/46] | Representative(s) | Lewandowsky, Klaus, et al Kodak Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung 70323 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/32] | Lewandowsky, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al Kodak Aktiengesellschaft, Patentabteilung 70323 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1994/11] | Wagner, Karl H., et al WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/46] | Wagner, Karl H. WAGNER & GEYER, Patentanwälte, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93106665.8 | 23.04.1993 | [1993/46] | Priority number, date | US19920884969 | 15.05.1992 Original published format: US 884969 | [1993/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0569758 | Date: | 18.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0569758 | Date: | 15.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/72 | [1993/46] | CPC: |
G06T15/20 (EP,US);
Y10S345/948 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/46] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Einrichtung zur Herstellung und zum Speichern von dreimensionalen Schriftzeichen und zum dreidimensionalen Schriftsatz | [1993/46] | English: | Method and apparatus for creating and storing three-dimensional font characters and performing three-dimensional typesetting | [1993/46] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour créer et mémoriser des caractères tridimensionnels et pour leur composition tridimensionnelle | [1993/46] | Examination procedure | 27.04.1995 | Examination requested [1995/26] | 15.10.1998 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1998/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS63103380 ; | [X]JPS63131270 ; | [X]JPH03138697 ; | [A]JPS6482178 | [DXY] - BARON ET AL, "Designer Letters: New 3D design and animation programs treat the "lowly letter" as design element", COMPUTER GRAPHICS WORLD, (199111), pages 73 - 78 [DX] 1-7,14,15,18,20 * page 74, column R, line L - page 77, column L, line 8 * * page 77, column L, paragraph L - column M, paragraph 3 * * page 78, column R, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * [DY] 8 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880916), vol. 12, no. 345, Database accession no. (P - 759), & JP63103380 A 00000000 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO. LTD.) [X] 1-8,14-20 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881017), vol. 12, no. 388, Database accession no. (P - 771), & JP63131270 A 00000000 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO. LTD.) [X] 1-8,14-20 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910911), vol. 15, no. 360, Database accession no. (P - 1250), & JP03138697 A 00000000 (MITA IND. CO. LTD.) [X] 1,4-6,14,18 * abstract * | [X] - FUCHS ET AL, "Pixel-Planes 5: a heterogeneous multiprocessor graphics system using processor-enhanced memories", INSPEC, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS, STEVENAGE, GB, (198907) [X] 1-4,8,14 * abstract * | [ ] - COMPUTER GRAPHICS, USA, (198907), vol. 23, no. 3, pages 79 - 88 | [Y] - LOVE ET AL, "Computer Generated Lenticular Stereograms", SPIE CONFERENCE ON THREE-DIMENSIONAL VISUALIZATION AND DISPLAY TECHNOLOGIES, LOS ANGELES, (198901), vol. 1083, pages 102 - 107 [Y] 8 * abstract * * Sections 3.1 and 6 * | [A] - TAM ET AL, "Chinese text in a graphics environment", INSPEC, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS, STEVENAGE, GB, (1988) [A] 1-4,8,14 * abstract * | [ ] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1988 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER PROCESSING OF CHINESE AND ORIENTAL LANGUAGES., TORONTO, CANADA, (198808), pages 591 - 594 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890714), vol. 13, no. 309, Database accession no. (P - 898), & JP01082178 A 00000000 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO. LTD.) [A] 1-8,14-20 * abstract * |