EP0568060 - Cassette screw bosses having ribbed surfaces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.05.1997 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2010 | Change - representative | published on 21.04.2010 [2010/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/44] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rambosek, G. Phillip, c/o Minnesota Mining and Manufact. Co., 2501 Hudson Road, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
Johanson, Bradley J., c/o Minnesota Mining and Manufact. Co., 2501 Hudson Road, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [1993/44] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1993/44] | Hilleringmann, Jochen, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 93106962.9 | 29.04.1993 | [1993/44] | Priority number, date | US19920877478 | 01.05.1992 Original published format: US 877478 | [1993/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0568060 | Date: | 03.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0568060 | Date: | 21.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G11B23/087 | [1993/44] | CPC: |
G11B23/08785 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1993/44] | Title | German: | Kassettenschraubenbuckeln mit gerippten Flächen | [1993/44] | English: | Cassette screw bosses having ribbed surfaces | [1993/44] | French: | Bossages pour vis dans une cassette ayant des parois à nervures | [1993/44] | Examination procedure | 21.04.1995 | Examination requested [1995/24] | 13.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.12.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/25] | 22.01.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1997/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0071996 (HITACHI MAXELL [JP]) [A] 1-3,8-11 * abstract *; | [A]DE3130877 (TDK ELECTRONICS CO LTD [JP]) [A] 4-7 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2219986 (SKC LTD [KR]) [A] 1-3 * abstract *; | [A]GB2210352 (SKC LTD [KR]) [A] 1-3 * abstract *; | [A]GB2024775 (TDK ELECTRONICS CO LTD) [A] 1-6,10 * figures 1-4; claim - *; | [A]JPH01134778 ; | [A]JPS6410479 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890828), vol. 013, no. 387, Database accession no. (P - 924), & JP01134778 A 19890526 (SONY) [A] 4-8 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890427), vol. 013, no. 180, Database accession no. (P - 864), & JP01010479 A 19890113 (MATSUSHITA) [A] 4-8 * abstract * |