EP0622728 - Region layout in a view on a graphical display screen [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.12.2000 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/44] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Feigel, Roy A. 1911 Gaylord Drive Austin, Texas 78728 / US | 02 /
Westermann, Herbert, Dr. Ammerstrasse 2 W-7032 Sindelfingen / DE | 03 /
Land, Jutta Schwarze Gasse 8 W-7039 Weil im Schönbuch / DE | 04 /
Burkhardt, Pit Hornbergerstrasse 24 W-7030 Böblingen / DE | [1994/44] | Representative(s) | Teufel, Fritz, et al IBM Deutschland Management & Business Support GmbH Patentwesen u. Urheberrecht 71137 Ehningen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/38] | Teufel, Fritz, Dipl.-Phys., et al IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH, Patentwesen und Urheberrecht 70548 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1994/44] | Jost, Ottokarl, Dipl.-Ing. IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH, Patentwesen und Urheberrecht D-70548 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 93107055.1 | 30.04.1993 | [1994/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0622728 | Date: | 02.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0622728 | Date: | 01.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/44 | [1994/44] | CPC: |
G06F9/451 (EP,US);
G06F40/103 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1994/44] | Title | German: | Bereich-layout in einer Sicht auf einem grafischen Anzeigeschirm | [1994/44] | English: | Region layout in a view on a graphical display screen | [1994/44] | French: | Organisation de la région dans une vue sur un écran d'affichage | [1994/44] | Examination procedure | 27.02.1995 | Examination requested [1995/17] | 02.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.10.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.08.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.03.2000 | BE | 01.03.2000 | CH | 01.03.2000 | ES | 01.03.2000 | LI | 01.03.2000 | NL | 01.03.2000 | SE | 01.03.2000 | [2003/07] |
Former [2002/25] | AT | 01.03.2000 | |
BE | 01.03.2000 | ||
CH | 01.03.2000 | ||
ES | 01.03.2000 | ||
LI | 01.03.2000 | ||
SE | 01.03.2000 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 01.03.2000 | |
BE | 01.03.2000 | ||
CH | 01.03.2000 | ||
LI | 01.03.2000 | ||
SE | 01.03.2000 | ||
Former [2001/08] | AT | 01.03.2000 | |
BE | 01.03.2000 | ||
CH | 01.03.2000 | ||
LI | 01.03.2000 | ||
Former [2000/52] | CH | 01.03.2000 | |
LI | 01.03.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP02257373 ; | [A]EP0376420 (SOFTVIEW INC [US]); | [X]EP0398646 (IBM [US]); | [A]US5107443 (SMITH RANDALL B [US], et al) | [AD] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN vol. 35, no. 2, July 1992, ARMONK, NY, US pages 58 - 63 'Graphical definition of configuration objects' | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 015, no. 015 (P-1151)11 January 1991 & JP-A-02 257 373 ( TOPPAN PRINTING CO. LTD ) 18 October 1990, & JP02257373 A 19901018 | Examination | - IBM TDB "Graphical Definition of Configuration Objects" 02.07.92 |