EP0570742 - Reusable earless clamp structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.09.1998 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 16.02.2000 [2000/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hans Oetiker AG Maschinen- und Apparatefabrik Oberdorfstrasse 21 8812 Horgen / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1997/44] | For all designated states Hans Oetiker AG Maschinen- und Apparatefabrik Oberdorfstrasse 21 8812 Horgen / CH | ||
Former [1993/47] | For all designated states Hans Oetiker AG Maschinen- und Apparatefabrik Oberdorfstrasse 21 CH-8812 Horgen / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oetiker, Hans Oberdorfstrasse 21 CH-8812 Horgen / CH | [1993/47] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/47] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf Groening & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93107075.9 | 30.04.1993 | [1993/47] | Priority number, date | US19920886337 | 20.05.1992 Original published format: US 886337 | [1993/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0570742 | Date: | 24.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0570742 | Date: | 29.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F16L33/02 | [1993/47] | CPC: |
F16L33/035 (EP,US);
F16L3/00 (KR);
Y10T24/1457 (EP,US);
Y10T24/1478 (EP,US);
Y10T24/1482 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1993/47] | Title | German: | Wiederverwendbare ohrlose Rohrschelle | [1993/47] | English: | Reusable earless clamp structure | [1993/47] | French: | Collier d'attache réutilisable sans oreilles | [1993/47] | Examination procedure | 17.01.1994 | Examination requested [1994/11] | 09.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 24.04.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 30.04.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 29.10.1997 | LU | 30.04.1998 | [2000/05] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2374541 (HARTMAN RICHARD A); | [AD]US3475793 (OETIKER HANS); | [A]GB2175042 (OETIKER HANS); | [AD]US4712278 (OETIKER HANS [CH]); | [A]US4802261 (MIZUKOSHI YASUMASA [JP], et al) |