EP0568962 - Device for the production of a hollow body for the placement of optical fibres and process for the production of the hollow object [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.10.1997 [1997/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/45] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schneider, Reiner Flurstrasse 32 W-8624 Ebersdorf bei Coburg / DE | [1993/45] | Application number, filing date | 93107176.5 | 03.05.1993 | [1993/45] | Priority number, date | DE19924215185 | 08.05.1992 Original published format: DE 4215185 | [1993/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0568962 | Date: | 10.11.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0568962 | Date: | 16.10.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B29C47/90, B29C47/00 | [1993/45] | CPC: |
B29C48/908 (EP,US);
B29C48/09 (EP,US);
B29C48/90 (EP,US);
B29C48/905 (EP,US);
B29C48/06 (EP,US);
B29C48/913 (EP,US);
B29C48/9135 (EP,US);
B29C48/919 (EP,US);
B29L2011/0075 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1993/45] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zur Herstellung eines Kammerkörpers für die Aufnahme von Lichtwellenleitern und Verfahren zur Herstellung des Kammerkörpers | [1993/45] | English: | Device for the production of a hollow body for the placement of optical fibres and process for the production of the hollow object | [1993/45] | French: | Dispositif pour la fabrication d'un produit vide pour la distribution des fibres optiques et procédé pour sa fabrication | [1993/45] | Examination procedure | 19.04.1994 | Examination requested [1994/24] | 28.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.04.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3296661 (DE MOUSTIER HENRI); | [X]US3538210 (GATTO CHARLES); | [A]GB2015418 (DYNAMIT NOBEL AG); | [A]EP0086623 (DEZEN VITTORIO); | [X]US5053091 (GILJAM KENNETH J [US], et al) |