Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0587984 | Global Dossier | 03.09.1997 | B1 | EP0587984 | 23.03.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE9212575 | 18.09.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE157548T | 15.09.1997 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE9212575 | 18.09.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59307251D1 | 09.10.1997 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE9212575 | 18.09.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE9212575U | 26.11.1992 | U1 | Priority number | Date | DE9212575 | 18.09.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2106221T | 01.11.1997 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE9212575 | 18.09.1992 |