EP0569008 - Acceleration of silver removal by thioether compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.01.2000 [2000/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/45] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmittou, Eric Richard, c/o EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New york 14650-2201 / US | 02 /
Hastreiter, Jacob John, Jr., c/o EASTMAN KODAK CO. Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New york 14650-2201 / US | 03 /
Gordon, Stuart Terrance, c/o EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New york 14650-2201 / US | [1993/45] | Representative(s) | Brandes, Jürgen, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/45] | Brandes, Jürgen, Dr. rer. nat., et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93107354.8 | 06.05.1993 | [1993/45] | Priority number, date | US19920880423 | 08.05.1992 Original published format: US 880423 | [1993/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0569008 | Date: | 10.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0569008 | Date: | 03.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G03C7/42, G03C5/38 | [1993/45] | CPC: |
G03C5/38 (EP,US);
G03C7/42 (EP,US);
G03C7/421 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1998/38] |
Former [1993/45] | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL | Title | German: | Beschleunigung der Silberentfernung durch Thioetherverbindungen | [1993/45] | English: | Acceleration of silver removal by thioether compounds | [1993/45] | French: | Accélération de la récupération de l'argent par composés thioéthers | [1993/45] | Examination procedure | 22.04.1994 | Examination requested [1994/24] | 06.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.02.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.08.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.11.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US4960683 (OKAZAKI MASAKI [JP], et al); | [Y]EP0428101 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]); | [Y]US5043253 (ISHIKAWA TAKATOSHI [JP]) |