Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
12.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.10.1997 [1997/44] |
20.09.1996 | (Expected) grant | published on 06.11.1996 [1996/45] |
15.08.1996 | Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
08.06.1996 | Renewal fee | |
03.05.1996 | Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
30.03.1996 | Communication of intention to grant | |
11.05.1995 | First examination report | |
23.04.1994 | Request for examination filed | published on 15.06.1994 [1994/24] |
03.12.1993 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 19.01.1994 [1994/03] |