EP0570780 - Chloroethylsulphonylbenzaldehydes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.01.1997 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.02.1997 [1997/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/47] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marschner, Claus, Dr. Am Wasserturm 7 W-6720 Speyer / DE | 02 /
Patsch, Manfred, Dr. Fritz-Wendel-Strasse 4 W-6706 Wachenheim / DE | [1996/10] |
Former [1993/47] | 01 /
Marschner, Claus, dr. Am Wasserturm 7 W-6720 Speyer / DE | ||
02 /
Patsch, Manfred, Dr. Fritz-Wendel-Strasse 4 W-6706 Wachenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 93107419.9 | 07.05.1993 | [1993/47] | Priority number, date | DE19924216590 | 20.05.1992 Original published format: DE 4216590 | [1993/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0570780 | Date: | 24.11.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0570780 | Date: | 06.03.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C07C317/24 | [1993/47] | CPC: |
C07C317/24 (EP,KR,US);
C07C309/28 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1993/47] | Title | German: | Chlorethylsulfonylbenzaldehyde | [1993/47] | English: | Chloroethylsulphonylbenzaldehydes | [1993/47] | French: | Chloroéthylsulfonylbenzaldéhydes | [1993/47] | Examination procedure | 13.09.1993 | Examination requested [1993/47] | 30.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 05.09.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 08.09.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.12.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0309839 (HOECHST AG [DE]) | Examination | EP0587030 |